Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-32186

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Marvin Isgur
Case #: 4:21-ap-03936
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Oct 26, 2021
Terminated:Oct 18, 2024
Last checked: Friday Dec 06, 2024 9:16 AM CST
Defendant
Brown & Fortunato, P.C.
905 S. Fillmore Suite 400
Amarillo, TX 79101
Represented By
Megan M Adeyemo
Gordon & Rees LLP
contact info
Christopher Michael Raney
Gordon & Rees
contact info
Mark W Thayer
Gordon & Rees LLP
contact info
Brown & Fortunato, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Yvette Austin
Represented By
John James Sparacino
Mckool Smith
contact info
Joshua James Newcomer
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Foreman, Liquidating Trustee of the Alliance Health Liquidating Trust
Represented By
Joshua James Newcomer
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Plaintiff
Mark Shapiro
Terminated: 02/02/2023
Represented By
Marilee A. Mark
Cimo Mark PLLC
contact info
David C Cimo
Cimo Mark PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Yvette Austin Smith
Terminated: 07/10/2023
Represented By
John James Sparacino
Mckool Smith
contact info
Marilee A. Mark
Cimo Mark PLLC
contact info
Joshua James Newcomer
contact info
David C Cimo
Cimo Mark PLLC
contact info

GPO Aug 21 2023
Memorandum Opinion, Signed on 8/21/2023 (Related document(s):56 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding) (SierraThomasAnderson)

Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, October 18, 2024
court Close Adversary Case Fri 10/18 8:57 AM
Joint Stipulated Dismissal Under Rule 41. Adversary Case 4:21-ap-3936 Closed. (SierraThomasAnderson)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
111 111 notice Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Thu 10/17 3:35 PM
Joint Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Brown & Fortunato, P.C., Michael Foreman, Liquidating Trustee of the Alliance Health Liquidating Trust (Newcomer, Joshua)
Related: [-]