Murray Energy Holdings Co., et al. v. Earth Support Services, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:19-bk-56885
Lead BK case is: 2:19-bk-56885
Ohio Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | John E Hoffman Jr |
Case #: | 2:21-ap-02053 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Oct 27, 2021 |
Terminated: | Aug 21, 2023 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Earth Support Services, Inc.
25 Allegheny Square
Glassport, PA 15045 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Murray Energy Holdings Co., et al.
410 Park Avenue Suite 900
New York, NY 10022 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:09 PM EDT |
Monday, August 21, 2023 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 08/21 3:01 PM
Adversary Case 2:21-ap-2053 Closed (kam) |
||
Thursday, August 10, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding
Thu 08/10 10:35 AM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Murray Energy Holdings Co., et al.. (Casteel, Kara) |
|
Saturday, July 15, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
BNC
Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document - BNC
Sun 07/16 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 07/15/2023. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, July 12, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
order
Extend/Shorten Time
Thu 07/13 10:16 AM
Agreed Order Regarding Joint Motion to Continue Discovery and Related Deadlines (kam) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 05/08 10:03 AM
Certificate of Service of Plaintiffs Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures Filed by Plaintiff Murray Energy Holdings Co., et al. . (Casteel, Kara) |
|
Tuesday, May 02, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Withdrawal
Tue 05/02 10:25 AM
Withdrawal Filed by Plaintiff Murray Energy Holdings Co., et al. . (Casteel, Kara) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, May 01, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Extend/Shorten Time
Mon 05/01 4:25 PM
Agreed Motion to Extend/Shorten Time for Discovery and Related Deadlines Filed by Plaintiff Murray Energy Holdings Co., et al. (Casteel, Kara) Modified on 5/2/2023 (kam) |
|
Wednesday, February 08, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Extend/Shorten Time
Wed 02/08 2:30 PM
Motion to Extend/Shorten Time (to Continue Discovery and Related Deadlines) Filed by Plaintiff Murray Energy Holdings Co., et al. (Casteel, Kara) |
|
Saturday, October 01, 2022 | ||
13 | 13
BNC
Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document - BNC
Sun 10/02 12:07 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 10/01/2022. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, September 29, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 09/29 1:47 PM
Pretrial Scheduling Order Following Telephonic Pretrial Conference Discovery Due: 2/18/2023. Dispositive Motion Due: 3/20/2023. . (kam) |
|
Tuesday, September 27, 2022 | ||
court
Hearing Held (Other)
Tue 09/27 12:02 PM
Proceeding Memo: 9/21/2022 Pretrial held. Court to issue order following pretrial conference establishing a discovery cutoff of February 18, 2023 and a dispositive motions deadline of March 20, 2023; If dispositive motions are not filed, Court will set a follow-up telephonic status conference to set a trial date and associated deadlines. Appearances: Gary Underdahl, attorney for Plaintiff; Christopher Davis, Attorney for Defendant. (blg) |
||
Wednesday, September 14, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Pretrial Statement
Wed 09/14 2:26 PM
Joint Pretrial Statement Filed by Plaintiff Murray Energy Holdings Co., et al. . (Casteel, Kara) |
|
Wednesday, July 20, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
BNC
Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document - BNC
Thu 07/21 12:07 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 07/20/2022. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, July 18, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 07/18 3:29 PM
General Pretrial Order and Notice of Telephonic Pretrial Conference. Pretrial set for 9/21/2022 at 11:00 AM Columbus Telephone for1 , Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 9/14/2022. . (kam) |
|
Wednesday, March 30, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 03/30 3:27 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Earth Support Services, Inc..(Richards, Kenneth) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Verification | ||
Monday, February 28, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Stipulation
Mon 02/28 7:56 AM
Stipulation with Plaintiff and Defendant as to Extension of Time To Respond to Complaint Through March 30, 2022 Filed by Defendant Earth Support Services, Inc.. (Richards, Kenneth) |
|
Monday, January 31, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Stipulation
Mon 01/31 10:08 AM
Stipulation with Plaintiff and Defendant as to Extension of time to Respond to Complaint Filed by Defendant Earth Support Services, Inc.. (Richards, Kenneth) |
|
Monday, January 03, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Stipulation
Mon 01/03 9:57 AM
Stipulation with Plaintiff and Defendant as to Extension of Time Filed by Defendant Earth Support Services, Inc.. (Richards, Kenneth) |
|
Monday, December 13, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Stipulation
Mon 12/13 12:09 PM
Stipulation with Plaintiff and Defendant as to Deadline to Respond to Complaint Filed by Defendant Earth Support Services, Inc.. (Richards, Kenneth) |
|
Friday, October 29, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 10/29 9:13 AM
Summons Service Executed on Earth Support Services, Inc. 10/29/2021 (Casteel, Kara) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Summons Issued
Fri 10/29 9:13 AM
Summons Issued on Earth Support Services, Inc. Date Issued 10/29/2021, Answer Due 11/29/2021 (Casteel, Kara) |
|
Wednesday, October 27, 2021 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 10/27 4:03 PM
Adversary case 2:21-ap-02053. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)): Complaint by Murray Energy Holdings Co., et al. against Earth Support Services, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (Casteel, Kara) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |