Murray Energy Holdings Co., et al. v. GMS Mine Repair and Maintenance, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:19-bk-56885
Lead BK case is: 2:19-bk-56885
Ohio Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | John E Hoffman Jr |
Case #: | 2:21-ap-02054 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Oct 27, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
GMS Mine Repair and Maintenance, Inc.
32 Enterprise Drive
Oakland, MD 21550 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Murray Energy Holdings Co., et al.
410 Park Avenue Suite 900
New York, NY 10022 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:09 PM EDT |
Saturday, October 15, 2022 | ||
15 | 15
BNC
Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document - BNC
Sun 10/16 12:07 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 10/15/2022. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, October 12, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
4
pgs
order
Order (Generic)
Thu 10/13 11:06 AM
Agreed Order Holding Adversary Poceeding In Abeyance . (ttw) |
|
Tuesday, September 27, 2022 | ||
court
Hearing Held (Other)
Tue 09/27 11:49 AM
Proceeding Memo: 9/21/2022 Pretrial held. Counsel to submit an agreed order holding adversary in abeyance. Appearances: Gary Underdahl, Attorney for Plaintiff; Philip K. Stovall, Attorney for Defendant. (blg) |
||
Wednesday, September 14, 2022 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Pretrial Statement
Wed 09/14 3:02 PM
Joint Pretrial Statement Filed by Defendant GMS Mine Repair and Maintenance, Inc. . (Stovall, Philip) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Wed 09/14 2:35 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by David M. Whittaker Filed by Defendant GMS Mine Repair and Maintenance, Inc.. (Whittaker, David) |
|
Wednesday, July 20, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
BNC
Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document - BNC
Thu 07/21 12:07 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 07/20/2022. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, July 18, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 07/18 3:32 PM
General Pretrial Order and Notice of Telephonic Pretrial Conference. Pretrial set for 9/21/2022 at 11:30 AM Columbus Telephone for1 , Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 9/14/2022. . (kam) |
|
Tuesday, March 15, 2022 | ||
court
Hearing Canceled
Tue 03/15 2:05 PM
Proceeding Memo: 3/15/2022 Telephonic pretrial conference not held. The Court advised the parties that the adversary proceeding will be held in abeyance and that the pretrial conference would be rescheduled after the Court issues its opinion on the summary judgment motions regarding the Debtors' First Omnibus Objection to Certain Mechanic's Lien Claims. (BLG) |
||
Friday, March 11, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Pretrial Statement
Fri 03/11 2:20 PM
Joint Pretrial Statement Filed by Defendant GMS Mine Repair and Maintenance, Inc. . (Stovall, Philip) |
|
Friday, February 11, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
BNC
Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document - BNC
Sat 02/12 12:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 02/11/2022. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, February 09, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 02/09 11:40 AM
General Pretrial Order and Notice of Telephonic Pretrial Conference. Pretrial set for 3/16/2022 at 10:30 AM Columbus Telephone for1 , Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 3/11/2022. . (2km) |
|
Wednesday, December 29, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 12/29 5:17 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by GMS Mine Repair and Maintenance, Inc.. (Stovall, Philip) |
|
Tuesday, November 23, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Stipulation
Tue 11/23 5:01 PM
Stipulation with Plaintiffs and Defendant as to Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to Complaint Filed by Defendant GMS Mine Repair and Maintenance, Inc.. (Stovall, Philip) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Tue 11/23 4:57 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Philip K Stovall Filed by Defendant GMS Mine Repair and Maintenance, Inc.. (Stovall, Philip) |
|
Friday, October 29, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 10/29 9:14 AM
Summons Service Executed on GMS Mine Repair and Maintenance, Inc. 10/29/2021 (Casteel, Kara) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Summons Issued
Fri 10/29 9:14 AM
Summons Issued on GMS Mine Repair and Maintenance, Inc. Date Issued 10/29/2021, Answer Due 11/29/2021 (Casteel, Kara) |
|
Wednesday, October 27, 2021 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 10/27 4:05 PM
Adversary case 2:21-ap-02054. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)): Complaint by Murray Energy Holdings Co., et al. against GMS Mine Repair and Maintenance, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (Casteel, Kara) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |