Murray Energy Holdings Co., et al. v. Greer Industries, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:19-bk-56885
Lead BK case is: 2:19-bk-56885
Ohio Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | John E Hoffman Jr |
Case #: | 2:21-ap-02055 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Oct 27, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jan 21, 2022 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Greer Industries, Inc.
570 Canyon Road
Morgantown, WV 26508 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Murray Energy Holdings Co., et al.
410 Park Avenue Suite 900
New York, NY 10022 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:09 PM EDT |
Friday, January 21, 2022 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 01/21 8:25 AM
Adversary Case 2:21-ap-2055 Closed (2km) |
||
Thursday, January 20, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
BNC
Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document - BNC
Fri 01/21 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 01/20/2022. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, January 18, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Dismissal (AP)
Tue 01/18 4:34 PM
Notice of Dismissal (AP) Filed by Plaintiff Murray Energy Holdings Co., et al..(Casteel, Kara) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
4 | 4
order
Proposed Dismissal
Tue 01/18 2:07 PM
Order Proposing Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding. Objections Due: 2/8/2022. (2km) |
|
Friday, October 29, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 10/29 9:16 AM
Summons Service Executed on Greer Industries, Inc. 10/29/2021 (Casteel, Kara) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Summons Issued
Fri 10/29 9:15 AM
Summons Issued on Greer Industries, Inc. Date Issued 10/29/2021, Answer Due 11/29/2021 (Casteel, Kara) |
|
Wednesday, October 27, 2021 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 10/27 4:08 PM
Adversary case 2:21-ap-02055. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)): Complaint by Murray Energy Holdings Co., et al. against Greer Industries, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (Casteel, Kara) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |