Original Case: 1:20-cv-01689

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:20-cv-03815
Typecivil / united states
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Case Filed:Nov 06, 2020
Terminated:Oct 29, 2021
Last checked: Monday Nov 01, 2021 4:28 AM EDT
Defendant
United States of America
Defendant
United States Department of Labor
Defendant
Martin J. Walsh, Secretary of the United States Department of Labor
Defendant
Eugene Scalia, Esq., Secretary of the United States Department of Labor
Intervenor - Appellant
American Lodging and Hotel Association
Represented By
Maurice Baskin
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Intervenor - Appellant
Associated Builders and Contractors
Represented By
Maurice Baskin
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Intervenor - Appellant
National Retail Federation
Represented By
Maurice Baskin
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Intervenor - Appellant
HR Policy Association
Represented By
Maurice Baskin
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Intervenor - Appellant
The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Represented By
Maurice Baskin
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Intervenor - Appellant
International Franchise Association
Represented By
Maurice Baskin
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Movant
Washington Legal Foundation
Represented By
John Mercer Masslon II
Washington Legal Foundation
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
State of Rhode Island
Represented By
Judith Naomi Vale
New York State Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Steven Wu
New York State Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Commonwealth of Virginia
Represented By
Judith Naomi Vale
New York State Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Steven Wu
New York State Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
State of Vermont
Represented By
Judith Naomi Vale
New York State Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Steven Wu
New York State Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
State of Washington
Represented By
Judith Naomi Vale
New York State Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Steven Wu
New York State Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
State of New York
Represented By
Judith Naomi Vale
New York State Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Steven Wu
New York State Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
State of Oregon
Represented By
Judith Naomi Vale
New York State Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Steven Wu
New York State Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
State of New Mexico
Represented By
Judith Naomi Vale
New York State Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Steven Wu
New York State Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
State of New Jersey
Represented By
Judith Naomi Vale
New York State Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Steven Wu
New York State Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
State of Minnesota
Represented By
Judith Naomi Vale
New York State Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Steven Wu
New York State Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Stete of Michigan
Represented By
Judith Naomi Vale
New York State Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Steven Wu
New York State Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Commonwealth of Massachusetts
Represented By
Judith Naomi Vale
New York State Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Steven Wu
New York State Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
State of Maryland
Represented By
Judith Naomi Vale
New York State Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Steven Wu
New York State Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
State of Illinois
Represented By
Judith Naomi Vale
New York State Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Sarah A. Hunger
Illinois Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Steven Wu
New York State Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
District of Columbia
Represented By
Judith Naomi Vale
New York State Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Steven Wu
New York State Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
State of Delaware
Represented By
Judith Naomi Vale
New York State Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Steven Wu
New York State Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
State of Colorado
Represented By
Eric Reuel Olson
Colorado Department of Law
contact info
Judith Naomi Vale
New York State Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Steven Wu
New York State Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
State of California
Represented By
Judith Naomi Vale
New York State Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Steven Wu
New York State Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Commonwealth of Pennsylvania
Represented By
Judith Naomi Vale
New York State Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Steven Wu
New York State Office of the Attorney General
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/01/2021 4:27 AM EDT
Friday, November 06, 2020
1 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant American Lodging and Hotel Association, Associated Builders and Contractors, HR Policy Association, International Franchise Association, National Retail Federation and The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America in 20-3815 FILED. [2971701] 20-3815 20-3806 [Entered: 11/10/2020 12:09 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax
Att: 2 25 pgs Case FILED
2 2 30+ pgs DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER, dated 09/08/2020, RECEIVED.[2971729] 20-3815 [Entered: 11/10/2020 12:26 PM]
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 09/08/2020, RECEIVED.[2971730] 20-3815 [Entered: 11/10/2020 12:27 PM]
Related: [-]
4 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant American Lodging and Hotel Association, Associated Builders and Contractors, HR Policy Association, International Franchise Association, National Retail Federation and The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, district court receipt # ANYSDC-22471839, FILED.[2971732] 20-3815 [Entered: 11/10/2020 12:28 PM]
Related: [-]
5 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2971735] 20-3815 [Entered: 11/10/2020 12:29 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed
Att: 2 49 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED