New York Southern District Court
Judge:Gregory H Woods
Case #: 1:20-cv-01689
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause05:551 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Feb 26, 2020
Terminated:Sep 08, 2020
Last checked: Monday Aug 24, 2020 5:40 AM EDT
ADR Provider
The Society for Human Resource Management
1800 Duke St
Alexandria, VA 22314
Represented By
Charles Michael Guzak
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Defendant
Eugene Scalia
Represented By
Natasha Waglow Teleanu
United States Attorney'S Office, Sdny
contact info
Defendant
United States of America
Represented By
Natasha Waglow Teleanu
United States Attorney'S Office, Sdny
contact info
Defendant
United States Department of Labor
Represented By
Natasha Waglow Teleanu
United States Attorney'S Office, Sdny
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
1615 H Street, NW
Washington, DC 20062
Represented By
Maurice Baskin
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Eli Zev Freedberg
Littler Mendelson, P.C. (nyc)
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
National Retail Federation
1101 New York Avenue NW Suite 1200
Washington,, DC 20005
Represented By
Maurice Baskin
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Eli Zev Freedberg
Littler Mendelson, P.C. (nyc)
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
International Franchise Association
1900 K Street, NW, Suite 700
Washington, DC 20006
Represented By
Maurice Baskin
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Eli Zev Freedberg
Littler Mendelson, P.C. (nyc)
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
HR Policy Association
1001 19th Street North, Suite 1002
Arlington, VA 22209
Represented By
Maurice Baskin
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Eli Zev Freedberg
Littler Mendelson, P.C. (nyc)
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
Associated Builders and Contractors
440 1st St., N.W., Ste., 200
Washington, DC 20001
Represented By
Maurice Baskin
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Eli Zev Freedberg
Littler Mendelson, P.C. (nyc)
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
American Lodging and Hotel Association
1250 Eye Street, N.W., Suite 1100
Washington, DC 20005
Represented By
Maurice Baskin
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Eli Zev Freedberg
Littler Mendelson, P.C. (nyc)
contact info
Movant
Restaurant Law Center
2055 L St. NW Suite 700
Washington, DC 20036
Represented By
Lisa M. Lewis
Sheppard, Mullin, Richter & Hampton
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Oregon
Represented By
Marc Abrams
Oregon Department Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Washington
Represented By
Jeffrey T. Sprung
State Of Washington, Attorney General'S Office
contact info
James Mills
Wa State Attorney General Office
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Vermont
Represented By
Julio A Thompson
State Of Vermont Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Rhode Island
Represented By
Justin James Sullivan
Ri Department Of Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
Commonwealth of Massachusetts
Represented By
Andrew H Cahill
Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
State of New Mexico
Represented By
Tania Maestas
Nm Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
State of New Jersey
Represented By
Estelle Bronstein
Nj Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Minnesota
Represented By
Jonathan Dean Moler
Minnesota Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Michigan
Represented By
Matthew Lee Walker
Michigan Attorney General
contact info
Zachary A Risk
Michigan Dept. Of Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Maryland
Represented By
Jeffrey Paul Dunlap
Office Of The Attorney General- State Of Maryland
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Illinois
Represented By
Alvar Ayala
Illinois Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Delaware
Represented By
Christian Douglas Wright
Delaware Department Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Colorado
Represented By
Eric Olson
Colorado Department Of Law
contact info
Plaintiff
State of California
Represented By
Jennifer C Bonilla
California Department Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
State Of New York
Represented By
Julie Rivchin Ulmet
Office Of The New York State Attorney General
contact info
Matthew Colangelo
contact info
Fiona Jeannette Kaye
Nys Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
District of Columbia
Represented By
Kathleen Konopka
Dc Oag
contact info
Plaintiff
Commonwealth of Virginia
Represented By
Mamoona Siddiqui
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
Commonwealth of Pennsylvania
Represented By
Nancy A. Walker
Pennsylvania Office Of Attorney General
contact info
Ryan B Smith
Pennsylvania Office Of Attorney General
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, December 20, 2021
143 143 appeal USCA Mandate Mon 12/20 8:23 AM
MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to139 Notice of Appeal, filed by American Lodging and Hotel Association, National Retail Federation, The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, HR Policy Association, Associated Builders and Contractors, International Franchise Association,137 Notice of Appeal, filed by United States Department of Labor, Eugene Scalia, United States of America USCA Case Number 20-3806 L); 203816(Con). Defendants-Appellants move for a dismissal of their pending appeal as moot. Intervenors-Appellants oppose the motion. Intervenors-Appellants alternatively assert that, if the motion is granted, the order and judgment of the district court should be vacated, with which Defendants-Appellants agree. Upon due consideration, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED because the Department of Labor has rescinded the regulation from which injunctive relief was sought and, accordingly, there is no justiciable claim for relief. Video Tutorial Servs., Inc. v. MCI Telecomms. Corp ., 79 F.3d 3, 6 (2d Cir. 1996) (per curiam) (concluding that "[w]hen an appeal becomes moot" it must be dismissed because "we have no jurisdiction over moot controversies"). It is further ordered that the district court's order and judgment are VACATED, and the matter is REMANDED to the district court with instructions to dismiss the action as moot. Arizonans for Off. Eng. v. Arizona , 520 U.S. 43, 71 (1997) ("When a civil case becomes moot pending appellate adjudication, '[t]he established practice... in the federal system... is to reverse or vacate the judgment below and remand with a direction to dismiss.'" (quoting United States v. Munsingwear, Inc ., 340 U.S. 36, 39 (1950)). Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 12/20/2021..(tp)
Related: [-]
appeal Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to District Judge Mon 12/20 8:24 AM
Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to the District Judge re:143 USCA Mandate. (tp)
Related: [-]