Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-12269

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Craig T Goldblatt
Case #: 1:21-ap-51247
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Nov 05, 2021
Terminated:Dec 01, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Aquarius Chemical, LLC
Represented By
Aquarius Chemical, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
RPA Asset Management Services, LLC, Trustee of the MDC Litigation Trust
Represented By
Jason A. Gibson
The Rosner Law Group LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Wednesday, December 01, 2021
4 4 notice Dismissal - Notice Wed 12/01 12:08 PM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by RPA Asset Management Services, LLC (Gibson, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
court Close Adversary Case Wed 12/01 3:09 PM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-51247 Closed (MD)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 08, 2021
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Mon 11/08 12:47 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Aquarius Chemical, LLC. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 12/15/2021 at 01:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Gibson, Jason)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Proof of Service
2 2 crditcrd none Mon 11/08 9:56 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 21-51247 CTG] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number A10549733, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 05, 2021
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Fri 11/05 2:50 PM
Adversary case 21-51247 Complaint by RPA Asset Management Services, LLC against Aquarius Chemical, LLC. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 2/3/2022. (Gibson, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives