Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-12269

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Craig T Goldblatt
Case #: 1:21-ap-51248
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Nov 05, 2021
Terminated:Feb 08, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Creek Pipe Company LLC
Represented By
Creek Pipe Company LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
RPA Asset Management Services, LLC, Trustee of the MDC Litigation Trust
Represented By
Jason A. Gibson
The Rosner Law Group LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Tuesday, February 08, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Tue 02/08 9:02 AM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-51248 Closed (NR)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 07, 2022
13 13 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 02/07 4:54 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal Filed by RPA Asset Management Services, LLC. (Gibson, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 19, 2022
12 12 order Scheduling Order Wed 01/19 1:28 PM
Scheduling Order Related [+] Signed on 1/19/2022. (NAB)
Related: [-] 6
Friday, January 14, 2022
11 11 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Fri 01/14 6:08 PM
Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Ankura Consulting Group, LLC. (Fu, Michelle)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Fri 01/14 10:57 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Plan Administrator. Hearing scheduled for 1/19/2022 at 01:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Fu, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 13, 2021
9 9 order Appear pro hac vice Mon 12/13 2:02 PM
Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice for Roland Gary Jones, Esq. Related [+] Order Signed on 12/13/2021. (NAB)
Related: [-] lated Document(s)8
Sunday, December 12, 2021
8 8 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Sun 12/12 3:06 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Roland Gary Jones, Esq . Receipt Number ADEDC-3525, Filed by Creek Pipe Company LLC. (Tobia, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification by Counsel to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Friday, December 10, 2021
7 7 notice Rescheduled Hearing - Notice Fri 12/10 8:18 PM
Notice of Rescheduled Hearing //Notice of Adjourned Pretrial Conferences Hearing Originally Scheduled for 12/15/2021 has been rescheduled. Filed by RPA Asset Management Services, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 1/19/2022 at 01:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Gibson, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 08, 2021
6 6 misc Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order Wed 12/08 6:01 PM
Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order Filed by RPA Asset Management Services, LLC. (Gibson, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, December 03, 2021
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 12/03 11:47 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Creek Pipe Company LLC Mediation due date: 04/4/2022.(Tobia, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
4 4 notice Appearance - Notice Fri 12/03 11:28 AM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by Creek Pipe Company LLC (Tobia, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, November 08, 2021
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Mon 11/08 12:51 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Creek Pipe Company LLC. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 12/15/2021 at 01:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Gibson, Jason)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Proof of Service
2 2 crditcrd none Mon 11/08 9:56 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 21-51248 CTG] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number A10549733, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 05, 2021
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Fri 11/05 2:55 PM
Adversary case 21-51248 Complaint by RPA Asset Management Services, LLC against Creek Pipe Company LLC. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 2/3/2022. (Gibson, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives