Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-12269

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Craig T Goldblatt
Case #: 1:21-ap-51250
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Nov 05, 2021
Terminated:Dec 08, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Bond-Coat, Inc.
Represented By
Bond-Coat, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
RPA Asset Management Services, LLC, Trustee of the MDC Litigation Trust
Represented By
Jason A. Gibson
The Rosner Law Group LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 14 minutes ago
Wednesday, December 08, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Wed 12/08 10:17 AM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-51250 Closed (NR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 07, 2021
4 4 notice Dismissal - Notice Tue 12/07 5:01 PM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by RPA Asset Management Services, LLC (Gibson, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 08, 2021
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Mon 11/08 12:56 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Bond-Coat, Inc.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 12/15/2021 at 01:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Gibson, Jason)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Proof of Service
2 2 crditcrd none Mon 11/08 9:56 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 21-51250 CTG] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number A10549733, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 05, 2021
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Fri 11/05 3:00 PM
Adversary case 21-51250 Complaint by RPA Asset Management Services, LLC against Bond-Coat, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 2/3/2022. (Gibson, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives