Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-12269

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Craig T Goldblatt
Case #: 1:21-ap-51254
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Nov 05, 2021
Terminated:Jan 03, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Rock Tool Company
Represented By
Rock Tool Company
contact info
Plaintiff
RPA Asset Management Services, LLC, Trustee of the MDC Litigation Trust
Represented By
Jason A. Gibson
The Rosner Law Group LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Monday, January 03, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Mon 01/03 1:11 PM
Adversary Case 21-51254 Closed (SJM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 28, 2021
5 5 notice Dismissal - Notice Tue 12/28 4:42 PM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by RPA Asset Management Services, LLC (Gibson, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 10, 2021
4 4 notice Rescheduled Hearing - Notice Fri 12/10 8:18 PM
Notice of Rescheduled Hearing //Notice of Adjourned Pretrial Conferences Hearing Originally Scheduled for 12/15/2021 has been rescheduled. Filed by RPA Asset Management Services, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 1/19/2022 at 01:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Gibson, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 08, 2021
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Mon 11/08 1:04 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Rock Tool Company. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 12/15/2021 at 01:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Gibson, Jason)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Proof of Service
2 2 crditcrd none Mon 11/08 9:56 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 21-51254 CTG] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number A10549733, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 05, 2021
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Fri 11/05 3:15 PM
Adversary case 21-51254 Complaint by RPA Asset Management Services, LLC against Rock Tool Company. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 2/3/2022. (Gibson, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives