Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:20-bk-12814

Nevada Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mike K Nakagawa
Case #: 2:21-ap-01251
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Nov 19, 2021
Terminated:Oct 30, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS, LLC
C T CORPORATION SYSTEM AGENT SERVICE OF PROCESS 330 N. BRAND BLVD., STE 700
GLENDALE, CA 91203
Represented By
ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
ACF FINCO I, LP
7251 AMIGO ST, STE 210 ATTN: TALITHA GRAY KOZLOWSKI/GARRETT NYE
LAS VEGAS, NV 89119
Represented By
TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI
Bankruptcy Recovery Group, LLC
contact info
GARRETT H. NYE
Bankruptcy Recovery Group, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:06 PM PDT
Monday, October 30, 2023
43 43 court Close Adversary Case Mon 10/30 1:40 PM
Disposition and Closing of Adversary Case (mg)
Related: [-]
Saturday, October 07, 2023
42 42 court BNC Certificate of Notice - pdf Sat 10/07 9:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - pdf Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 10/07/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 40 Order of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding (BNC)
Thursday, October 05, 2023
40 40 orderad Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding (BNC) Thu 10/05 1:02 PM
Order of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding (BNC) Related [+] (mmm)
Related: [-] 39 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff ACF FINCO I, LP.
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
39 39 adv_misc Stipulation (Adv) Wed 10/04 3:35 PM
Stipulation By ACF FINCO I, LP and Between OneSource Distributors, LLC Stipulation Dismissing Adversary Proceeding and Vacating All Hearings Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF FINCO I, LP Related [+] (GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff ACF FINCO I, LP.
Friday, August 18, 2023
38 38 orderad Stipulated/Agreed Order (Adv) Fri 08/18 11:15 AM
Stipulated/Agreed Order Related [+] (arv)
Related: [-] 37 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff ACF FINCO I, LP.
Thursday, August 17, 2023
37 37 adv_misc Stipulation (Adv) Thu 08/17 3:57 PM
Stipulation By ACF FINCO I, LP and Between OneSource Distributors, LLC Stipulation to Vacate Trial and Associated Deadlines Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF FINCO I, LP (GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 04, 2023
36 36 orderad Stipulated/Agreed Order (Adv) Fri 08/04 1:02 PM
Stipulated/Agreed Order By and Between PLAINTIFF & DEFENDANT Related [+] (mmm)
Related: [-] 35 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff ACF FINCO I, LP.
Thursday, August 03, 2023
35 35 adv_misc Stipulation (Adv) Thu 08/03 4:06 PM
Stipulation By ACF FINCO I, LP and Between OneSource Distributors, LLC Stipulation to Extend Deadlines Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF FINCO I, LP Related [+] (GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA)
Related: [-] 12 Standard Discovery Plan/Request for Waiver of Filing Discovery Plan filed by Plaintiff ACF FINCO I, LP,16 Scheduling Order (BNC).
Tuesday, April 04, 2023
34 34 orderad Stipulated/Agreed Order (Adv) Tue 04/04 12:53 PM
Stipulated/Agreed Order Related [+] (cly)
Related: [-] 33 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff ACF FINCO I, LP.
Friday, March 31, 2023
33 33 adv_misc Stipulation (Adv) Fri 03/31 11:33 AM
Second Stipulation By ACF FINCO I, LP and Between OneSource Distributors, LLC Second Stipulation Regarding Pre-Trial Deadlines Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF FINCO I, LP Related [+] (GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA)
Related: [-] 12 Standard Discovery Plan/Request for Waiver of Filing Discovery Plan filed by Plaintiff ACF FINCO I, LP,16 Scheduling Order (BNC).
Thursday, January 26, 2023
32 32 answer Answer to Amended Complaint (d) Thu 01/26 3:23 PM
Answer to Amended Complaint with Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by PAMELA J. SCHOLEFIELD on behalf of ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS, LLC (SCHOLEFIELD, PAMELA)
Related: [-] 29
Friday, January 13, 2023
31 31 adv_misc Certificate of Service (ADV) Fri 01/13 1:10 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF FINCO I, LP Related [+] (GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA)
Related: [-] 29 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff ACF FINCO I, LP.
30 30 adv_misc Certificate of Service (ADV) Fri 01/13 1:10 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF FINCO I, LP Related [+] (GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA)
Related: [-] 28 Notice of Entry of Order filed by Plaintiff ACF FINCO I, LP.
Thursday, January 12, 2023
29 29 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 01/12 11:23 AM
Amended Complaint to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF FINCO I, LP against ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS, LLC (GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA)
Related: [-]
28 28 notice Entry of Order (Adv) Thu 01/12 11:19 AM
Notice of Entry of Order/Judgment Approving Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF FINCO I, LP Related [+](GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA)
Related: [-] 27 Order on Motion to Amend.
27 27 order Amend (ADV) Thu 01/12 8:52 AM
Order Granting Motion To Amend Related [+] (cly)
Related: [-] 23
Friday, December 09, 2022
26 26 adv_misc Certificate of Service (ADV) Fri 12/09 2:40 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF FINCO I, LP Related [+] (GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA)
Related: [-] 23 Motion to Amend filed by Plaintiff ACF FINCO I, LP,24 Notice of Hearing filed by Plaintiff ACF FINCO I, LP.
25 25 court Hearing Sched/Resched (Adv) Fri 12/09 9:22 AM
Hearing Scheduled/Rescheduled. Hearing scheduled 1/11/2023 at 10:30 AM at Remote. Related [+] (cly)
Related: [-] 23 Motion to Amend filed by Plaintiff ACF FINCO I, LP.
Thursday, December 08, 2022
24 24 notice Hearing (Adv) Thu 12/08 10:27 AM
Notice of Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 Hearing Date: 01/11/2023 Hearing Time: 10:30 a.m. Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF FINCO I, LP Related [+](GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA)
Related: [-] 23 Motion to Amend filed by Plaintiff ACF FINCO I, LP.
23 23 motion Amend (ADV) Thu 12/08 10:25 AM
Motion to Amend Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF FINCO I, LP Related [+] (GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff ACF FINCO I, LP.
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, December 07, 2022
22 22 orderad Stipulated/Agreed Order (Adv) Wed 12/07 8:16 AM
Stipulated/Agreed Order Related [+] (cly)
Related: [-] 21 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff ACF FINCO I, LP.
Tuesday, December 06, 2022
21 21 adv_misc Stipulation (Adv) Tue 12/06 10:30 AM
Stipulation By ACF FINCO I, LP and Between OneSource Distributors, LLC Stipulation Regarding Pre-trial Discovery Deadlines Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF FINCO I, LP Related [+] (GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA)
Related: [-] 12 Standard Discovery Plan/Request for Waiver of Filing Discovery Plan filed by Plaintiff ACF FINCO I, LP,16 Scheduling Order (BNC).
Thursday, November 03, 2022
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Notice - pdf Thu 11/03 9:40 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - pdf Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 11/03/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Scheduling Order (BNC)
Tuesday, November 01, 2022
19 19 court Hearing Sched/Resched (Trial-Adv) Tue 11/01 8:28 AM
Trial Scheduled/Rescheduled. Day: 4. Trial date set for 10/10/2023 at 09:30 AM at Remote. (cly)
Related: [-]
18 18 court Hearing Sched/Resched (Trial-Adv) Tue 11/01 8:28 AM
Trial Scheduled/Rescheduled. Day: 3. Trial date set for 10/5/2023 at 09:30 AM at Remote. (cly)
Related: [-]
17 17 court Hearing Sched/Resched (Trial-Adv) Tue 11/01 8:27 AM
Trial Scheduled/Rescheduled. Day: 2. Trial date set for 10/3/2023 at 09:30 AM at Remote. (cly)
Related: [-]
16 16 orderad Scheduling Order (BNC) Tue 11/01 8:25 AM
Order Regarding Pretrial and Trial Matters (BNC) Pre-Trial Conference set for 9/20/2023 at 09:30 AM at Remote. Trial date set for 10/2/2023 at 09:30 AM at Remote Related [+] (cly)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff ACF FINCO I, LP.
Thursday, October 06, 2022
15 15 court Minute Entry Continued (ADV) Tue 10/11 11:59 AM
Minute Entry Re: hearing on 10/6/2022 10:00 AM. Continued. Related [+] Appearances: TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI, PAMELA J. SCHOLEFIELD (Pre-Trial Hearing scheduled 09/20/2023 at 09:30 AM at MKN Teleconference Line. (cas)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by ACF FINCO I, LP
14 14 court Verified Petition Requirement (BNC-Adv) Thu 10/06 10:01 AM
Notice of Verified Petition Requirement Local Rule IA 11-2 Verified Petition due by 10/20/2022. Related [+] (cly)
Related: [-] 13 Notice of Appearance filed by Debtor OneSource Distributors, LLC.
Wednesday, October 05, 2022
13 13 adv_misc Notice of Appearance (Adv) Wed 10/05 4:53 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Papers Filed by MONIQUE D JEWETT-BREWSTER on behalf of OneSource Distributors, LLC (JEWETT-BREWSTER, MONIQUE)
Related: [-]
12 12 adv_misc Standard Discovery Plan/Request for Waiver of Filing Discovery Plan Wed 10/05 9:29 AM
Discovery Plan Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF FINCO I, LP Related [+] (GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff ACF FINCO I, LP.
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Thursday, March 17, 2022
11 11 adv_misc Certificate of Service (ADV) Thu 03/17 3:09 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF FINCO I, LP Related [+] (GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA)
Related: [-] 8 Notice of Hearing filed by Plaintiff ACF FINCO I, LP.
Wednesday, March 16, 2022
10 10 court Hearing Sched/Resched (Scheduling Conference) Wed 03/16 11:54 AM
Scheduling Conference scheduled for 10/6/2022 at 10:00 AM at Remote. Related [+] (cly)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff ACF FINCO I, LP.
Tuesday, March 15, 2022
9 9 court Minute Entry Continued (ADV) Tue 03/15 3:23 PM
Minute Entry Re: hearing on 3/24/2022 10:00 AM. Continued. Related [+] (Hearing scheduled 10/06/2022 at 10:00 AM at MKN Teleconference Line. (sm)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by ACF FINCO I, LP
8 8 notice Hearing (Adv) Tue 03/15 2:36 PM
Continued Notice of Hearing Notice of Continued Scheduling Conference Hearing Date: 10/06/2022 Hearing Time: 10:00 a.m. Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF FINCO I, LP (GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 14, 2022
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 01/14 6:58 PM
Answer to Complaint of OneSource Distributors, LLC with Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by PAMELA J. SCHOLEFIELD on behalf of ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS, LLC (SCHOLEFIELD, PAMELA)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, November 23, 2021
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 11/23 2:02 PM
Summons Service Executed on ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS, LLC 11/22/2021 Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF FINCO I, LP Related [+] (GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff ACF FINCO I, LP,5 Summons Issued.
Monday, November 22, 2021
5 5 court Summons Issued Mon 11/22 12:10 PM
Summons Issued on ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS, LLC (mmm)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Hearing Sched/Resched (Scheduling Conference) Mon 11/22 12:09 PM
Scheduling Conference scheduled for 3/24/2022 at 10:00 AM at Remote. Related [+] (mmm)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff ACF FINCO I, LP.
Friday, November 19, 2021
3 3 cmp Request to Issue Summons Fri 11/19 2:49 PM
Request to Issue Summons On: ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS, LLC. Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF FINCO I, LP (GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Fri 11/19 2:49 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Plaintiff ACF Finco I, LP's Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 7007.1 and LR 7007.1 Corporate parents added to case: Ares Holdings L.P., a Delaware entity.Corporate Affiliates added to case:, ACF FinCo GP LLC, a Delaware entity, ACF Intermediate GP LLC, a Delaware entity, ACF Intermediate Holdings LP, a Delaware entity, Ares Commercial Finance GP LP, a Delaware entity, Ares Commercial Finance LP, a Delaware entity, Ares Management Corporation, a Delaware entity, Ares Management Holdings LP, a Delaware entity, Ares Management LLC, a Delaware entity Plaintiff ACF Finco I, LP's Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 7007.1 and LR 7007.1 Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF FINCO I, LP (GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 11/19 2:42 PM
Adversary case 21-01251 Complaint Complaint to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547 and 550 Filed by ACF FINCO I, LP vs. ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS, LLC Fee Amount $350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)(GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA)
Related: [-]