California Eastern District Court
Judge:John A Mendez
Referred: Allison Claire
Case #: 2:21-cv-02168
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Nov 22, 2021
Last checked: Saturday May 21, 2022 2:51 AM PDT
Defendant
Shirley Weber
Represented By
Marisol Leon
California Department Of Justice
contact info
Lisa Janine Cisneros
California Department Of Justice
contact info
Delbert Tran
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Sophia Carrillo
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Laura Faer
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
National Center for Public Policy Research
Represented By
Daniel M. Ortner
Pacific Legal Foundation
contact info
Anastasia P. Boden
Pacific Legal Foundation
contact info

GPO Mar 24 2022
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/23/2022 GRANTING plaintiff until 3/25/2022 to file their Opposition to the 19 Motion to Stay with the Secretary's Reply due by 4/4/2022. (Coll, A)
GPO May 26 2022
ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 5/25/2022 ORDERING plaintiff's equal protection claim against AB 979 is DISMISSED with prejudice. Final judgment is entered in favor of the Defendant pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58(b). All relief sought in Plaintiff's complaint is DENIED. (Zignago, K.)

Docket last updated: 05/21/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, July 17, 2023
45 45 notice Notice (Other) Mon 07/17 9:10 AM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL by Shirley Weber. (Carrillo, Sophia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 06, 2023
44 44 appeal USCA Order/Mandate/Memo Thu 07/06 3:52 PM
USCA ORDER as to39 Notice of Appeal: Proceedings in this case will be held in abeyance until any appeal of the decision in Crest et al. v. Padilla, Case No. 19STCV27651 (Los Angeles Sup. Ct.) becomes final. Cf. Growe v. Emison, 507 U.S. 25, 32 (1993). If no petition for review is filed with the California Supreme Court, the parties shall notify this Court within 30 days after the deadline for filing a petition. The argument scheduled for August 25, 2023, is vacated. The docket is administratively closed pending further order of the Court. (Benson, A.)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 16, 2022
43 43 notice Notice (Other) Fri 09/16 1:14 PM
NOTICE by National Center for Public Policy Research. (Ortner, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 27, 2022
42 42 notice Notice (Other) Mon 06/27 3:55 PM
NOTICE by National Center for Public Policy Research. (Ortner, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 07, 2022
appeal USCA Case Number Tue 06/07 1:56 PM
USCA CASE NUMBER 22-15822 for39 Notice of Appeal filed by National Center for Public Policy Research. (Coll, A)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 01, 2022
40 40 appeal Appeal Processed to USCA Wed 06/01 7:40 AM
APPEAL PROCESSED to Ninth Circuit re39 Notice of Appeal filed by National Center for Public Policy Research. Notice of Appeal filed *5/27/2022*, Complaint filed *11/22/2021* and Appealed Order / Judgment filed *5/26/2022*. Court Reporter: *Jennifer Coulthard*. *Fee Status: Paid on 5/27/2022 in the amount of $505.00* (Kaminski, H)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appeal Information
Tuesday, May 31, 2022
appeal Appeal Processed to USCA Tue 05/31 2:37 PM
APPEAL PROCESSED to Ninth Circuit re39 Notice of Appeal filed by National Center for Public Policy Research. Notice of Appeal filed *5/27/2022*, Complaint filed *11/22/2021* and Appealed Order / Judgment filed *5/26/2022*. Court Reporter: *Jennifer Coulthard*. *Fee Status: Paid on 5/27/2022 in the amount of $505.00* (Kaminski, H)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 27, 2022
39 39 appeal Notice of Appeal Fri 05/27 7:25 AM
NOTICE of APPEAL by National Center for Public Policy Research. (Filing fee $ 505, receipt number ACAEDC-10252212) (Boden, Anastasia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 26, 2022
38 38 2 pgs order Order on Request Thu 05/26 9:35 AM
ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 5/25/2022 ORDERING plaintiff's equal protection claim against AB 979 is DISMISSED with prejudice. Final judgment is entered in favor of the Defendant pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58(b). All relief sought in Plaintiff's complaint is DENIED. (Zignago, K.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 24, 2022
37 37 misc Proposed Order Tue 05/24 4:29 PM
PROPOSED ORDER re34 Request for Dismissal and Entry of Final Judgment by National Center for Public Policy Research. (Boden, Anastasia)
Related: [-]
36 36 motion Request Tue 05/24 4:25 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL of35 Proposed Order re Dismissal and Entry of Final Judgment by National Center for Public Policy Research. (Boden, Anastasia)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 18, 2022
35 35 misc Proposed Order Wed 05/18 10:02 AM
PROPOSED ORDER re Dismissal and Entry of Final Judgment by National Center for Public Policy Research. (Boden, Anastasia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 17, 2022
34 34 motion Request Tue 05/17 11:33 AM
REQUEST for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice and Entry of Judgment by National Center for Public Policy Research. (Boden, Anastasia)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 29, 2022
33 33 misc Transcript Fri 04/29 12:44 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, MOTION TO STAY, MOTION TO DISMISS held on 4/19/22, before District Judge John A. Mendez, filed by Jennifer Coulthard, Phone number 530-537-9312 E-mail jenrmrcrr2@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 5/20/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/31/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2022. (Coulthard, Jennifer) Modified on 4/29/2022 (Coulthard, J)
Related: [-]
32 32 misc Transcript Ordering Form Fri 04/29 12:00 PM
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by National Center for Public Policy Research for proceedings held on 4/19/2022 before Judge John A. Mendez. Court Reporter Jennifer Coulthard. (Ortner, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 20, 2022
31 31 misc Transcript Ordering Form Wed 04/20 12:19 PM
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Shirley Weber for proceedings held on 4/19/2022 before Judge John Mendez. Court Reporter Jennifer Coulthard. (Carrillo, Sophia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 19, 2022
minutes Motion Hearing Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion to Stay Tue 04/19 4:04 PM
MINUTES for proceedings held before District Judge John A. Mendez: MOTION HEARING held on 4/19/2022. D. Ortner appeared for the plaintiff. S. Carrillo, L. Cisneros and J. Mass appeared for the defendant. The Court GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART Defendant's16 Motion to Dismiss, without prejudice and with leave to amend; GRANTED Plaintiff twenty (20) days to file an amended complaint; ORDERED Defendant to respond within twenty (20) days thereafter; and DENIED Defendant's19 Motion to Stay. Court Reporter: J. Coulthard. [TEXT ONLY ENTRY] (Michel, G.)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 18, 2022
28 28 misc Request for Telephonic Appearance Mon 04/18 11:49 AM
REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE at the 4/19/2022 Motion hearing by Shirley Weber. (Tran, Delbert)
Related: [-]
order Minute Order Mon 04/18 12:30 PM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy G. Michel for District Judge John A. Mendez on 4/18/2022: Defendant's28 Request for Telephonic Appearance is DENIED. IT IS SO ORDERED. [TEXT ONLY ENTRY] (Michel, G.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 12, 2022
27 27 misc Reply Tue 04/12 7:20 PM
REPLY by Shirley Weber re26 Opposition to Motion,16 Motion to Dismiss,. (Cisneros, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 05, 2022
26 26 respm Opposition to Motion Tue 04/05 5:21 PM
OPPOSITION by National Center for Public Policy Research to16 Motion to Dismiss,. (Boden, Anastasia)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 04, 2022
25 25 misc Reply Mon 04/04 8:08 PM
REPLY by Shirley Weber re19 Motion to Stay,.(Cisneros, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Lisa Cisneros
Friday, March 25, 2022
24 24 respm Opposition to Motion Fri 03/25 4:02 PM
OPPOSITION by National Center for Public Policy Research to19 Motion to Stay,. (Boden, Anastasia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 24, 2022
23 23 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Thu 03/24 9:57 AM
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/23/2022 GRANTING plaintiff until 3/25/2022 to file their Opposition to the19 Motion to Stay with the Secretary's Reply due by 4/4/2022. (Coll, A)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 23, 2022
22 22 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 03/23 1:55 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of due dates by National Center for Public Policy Research. (Boden, Anastasia)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 21, 2022
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/21 5:04 PM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Laura Faer on behalf of Shirley Weber. Attorney Faer, Laura added. (Faer, Laura)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 09, 2022
20 20 notice Notice to Reschedule Motion Hearing Wed 03/09 1:50 PM
NOTICE to RESCHEDULE HEARING on19 Motion to Stay, : Motion Hearing set for 4/19/2022 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Carrillo, Sophia)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 07, 2022
19 19 motion Stay Mon 03/07 7:15 PM
MOTION to STAY by Shirley Weber. Motion Hearing set for 5/17/2022 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez.(Carrillo, Sophia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Points and Authorities Defendant Secretary of State Shirley N. Weber's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal and State Court Trials,
Att: 2 Declaration of Sophia Carrillo,
Att: 3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendant Secretary of State Shirley N. Weber's Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal and State Court Trials
Monday, February 07, 2022
order Minute Order Mon 02/07 10:32 AM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy G. Michel for District Judge John A. Mendez on 2/7/2022: The parties are ORDERED to file an updated Joint Status Report pursuant to the provisions of F.R.Cv.P. 16 and 26, in accordance with Local Rule 240 and the Court's Order Requiring Service of Process and Joint Status Report, within thirty (30) days after the Court's ruling on Defendant's pending16 Motion to Dismiss. [TEXT ENTRY ONLY] (Michel, G.)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 04, 2022
17 17 misc Status Report Fri 02/04 8:23 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by Shirley Weber. (Cisneros, Lisa)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Dismiss Fri 02/04 8:21 PM
MOTION to DISMISS by Shirley Weber. Motion Hearing set for 4/19/2022 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez.(Cisneros, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Defendant Secretary of State's Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 2 Declaration of Betsy Bogart In Support of Secretary of State's Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Monday, December 27, 2021
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/27 9:01 AM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Delbert Tran on behalf of Shirley Weber. Attorney Tran, Delbert added. (Tran, Delbert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 22, 2021
14 14 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 12/22 1:20 PM
WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Shirley Weber on 12/6/2021, Answer due 2/4/2022 (Boden, Anastasia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 21, 2021
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/21 12:47 PM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Marisol Leon on behalf of Shirley Weber. Attorney Leon, Marisol added. (Leon, Marisol)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Civil New Case Documents for JAM Tue 12/21 12:45 PM
ORDER REQUIRING SERVICE OF PROCESS AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. (Michel, G.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Order re Filing Requirements
11 11 misc Civil New Case Documents for JAM Tue 12/21 12:43 PM
[DISREGARD] ORDER REQUIRING SERVICE OF PROCESS AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. (Michel, G.) Modified on 12/21/2021 (Michel, G.)
Related: [-]
10 10 2 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - 1 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Tue 12/21 11:26 AM
RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 12/20/2021 REASSIGNING this Case to District Judge John A. Mendez and Magistrate Judge Allison Claire for all further proceedings. And any dates currently set in this reassigned case only are hereby VACATED. The caption on documents filed in this REASSIGNED case shall be shown as 2:21-CV-02168 JAM-AC.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 17, 2021
9 9 notice Notice of Related Case Fri 12/17 6:05 PM
NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 2:19-cv-02288-JAM-AC, 2:21-cv-01951-JAM-AC by Shirley Weber. (Cisneros, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 14, 2021
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/14 3:56 PM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Sophia Carrillo on behalf of Shirley Weber. Attorney Carrillo, Sophia added. (Carrillo, Sophia)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 06, 2021
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/06 4:12 PM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Lisa Janine Cisneros on behalf of Shirley Weber. Attorney Cisneros, Lisa Janine added. (Cisneros, Lisa)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Related Case Mon 12/06 12:00 PM
NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 2:19-cv-02288, 2:21-cv-05644 by National Center for Public Policy Research. (Boden, Anastasia)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 22, 2021
5 5 misc Civil New Case Documents for KJM Mon 11/22 3:05 PM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 3/4/2022 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Coll, A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Standing Order,
Att: 2 Consent Form,
Att: 3 VDRP
4 4 service Summons Mon 11/22 3:03 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Shirley Weber* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Anastasia P. Boden* *Pacific Legal Foundation* *555 Capitol Mall, Suite 1290* *Sacramento, CA 95814*. (Coll, A)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Mon 11/22 1:53 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by National Center for Public Policy Research. (Boden, Anastasia)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Civil Cover Sheet Mon 11/22 1:43 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by National Center for Public Policy Research (Boden, Anastasia)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 11/22 1:39 PM
COMPLAINT against Shirley Weber by National Center for Public Policy Research. Attorney Boden, Anastasia P. added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9940319) (Boden, Anastasia)
Related: [-]
[DISREGARD - Issued in error] PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; (Coll, A) Modified on 11/22/2021 (Coll, A).
Related: [-]
order Prisoner New Case Documents for DJ Presider Mon 11/22 3:04 PM
[DISREGARD - Issued in error] PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; (Coll, A) Modified on 11/22/2021 (Coll, A)
Related: [-]