Original Case: 2:21-cv-02168

Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:22-cv-15822
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jun 06, 2022
Terminated:Jun 28, 2023
Last checked: Friday Jun 30, 2023 1:36 AM PDT
Amicus Curiae
COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES
Represented By
Veronica Randazzo
Los Angeles County Counsel
contact info
Amicus Curiae
COUNTY OF SANTA CLARA
Represented By
Veronica Randazzo
Los Angeles County Counsel
contact info
Amicus Curiae
CORPORATE AND SECURITIES LAW SCHOLARS
Represented By
James Fallows Tierney
University of Nebraska College of Law
contact info
Amicus Curiae
CONSTITUTIONAL LAW AND ANTI-DISCRIMINATION LAW SCHOLARS
Represented By
Kelly M. Dermody
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
CALIFORNIA WOMEN LAWYERS
Represented By
Melanie Gold
Complex Appellate Litigation Group, LLP
contact info
Johanna Schiavoni
Complex Appellate Litigation Group, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
SHIRLEY WEBER, in her official capacity as Secretary of State of the State of California
Represented By
Delbert Tran
California Department of Justice
contact info
Sophia Carrillo
California Department of Justice
contact info
Vilma Ruth Palma-Solana
AGCA-Office of the California Attorney General
contact info
Lisa Janine Cisneros
AGCA - Office of the California Attorney General
contact info
Laura Faer
California Department of Justice
contact info
Michael Louis Newman
AGCA-Office of the California Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
NATIONAL CENTER FOR PUBLIC POLICY RESEARCH
Represented By
Daniel Ortner
Pacific Legal Foundation
contact info
Joshua Paul Thompson
Pacific Legal Foundation
contact info
Anastasia P. Boden
Pacific Legal Foundation
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/30/2023 1:29 AM PDT
Monday, June 06, 2022
1 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant National Center for Public Policy Research Mediation Questionnaire due on 06/13/2022. Transcript ordered by 06/27/2022. Transcript due 07/26/2022. Appellant National Center for Public Policy Research opening brief due 09/06/2022. Appellee Shirley Weber answering brief due 10/04/2022. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12463930] (JMR) [Entered: 06/06/2022 09:45 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule
Att: 2 2 pgs Notice to all Parties and Counsel
Att: 3 22 pgs Case Opening Packet
Att: 4 1 pgs Mediation Letter