South Carolina District Court
Judge:Donald C Coggins, Jr
Case #: 1:21-cv-03798
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Nov 19, 2021
Last checked: Wednesday May 18, 2022 5:11 AM EDT
Defendant
Progressive Direct Insurance Company
Represented By
Zachary Andrew McEntyre
King And Spalding Llp (ga)
contact info
Julia C Barrett
King And Spalding LLP
contact info
Allison Hill White
King And Spalding Llp (ga)
contact info
Beattie B Ashmore
Beattie B Ashmore Law Office
contact info
James Matthew Brigman
King And Spalding Llp (ga)
contact info
Jeffrey S Cashdan
King And Spalding Llp (ga)
contact info
Plaintiff
Lynn Freeman
Represented By
Shane William Rogers
Johnson Smith Hibbard And Wildman
contact info
Tiffany Oldham
Carney Bates And Pulliam PLLC
contact info
Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Carney Bates And Pulliam PLLC
contact info
Edwin Lee Lowther, III
Carney Bates And Pulliam PLLC
contact info
William Douglas Smith
Johnson Smith Hibbard And Wildman
contact info
Jake Garrison Windley
Carney Bates And Pulliam PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, August 08, 2024
186 186 appeal Transmittal Sheet for Notice of Appeal to USCA Thu 08/08 1:19 PM
Transmittal Sheet for Notice of Appeal to USCA re183 Notice of Appeal, The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (jens)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
185 185 appeal Transcript - Appeal Wed 08/07 2:48 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings. Motions for dates of 05/10/2023, before Judge Donald C. Coggins Jr., re183 Notice of Appeal, Court Reporter/Transcriber Teresa B. Johnson, Telephone number/e-mail Teresa_johnson@scd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 7 calendar days from the filing of the transcript to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. Does this satisfy all appellate orders for this reporter? Y Redaction Request due 8/28/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/9/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/5/2024. (tjohnson, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
184 184 appeal Appeal Transcript Purchase Order Tue 08/06 4:33 PM
TRANSCRIPT PURCHASE ORDER by Progressive Direct Insurance Company for proceedings held on 07/24/2024 for Motions Hearing 5/10/24 before Judge Hon. Donald Coggins. Court Reporter: Teresa Johnson (Ashmore, Beattie)
Related: [-]
183 183 appeal Notice of Appeal Tue 08/06 3:51 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to160 Sealed Order,158 Order on Motion to Certify Class,, Order on Motion to Exclude,,,,,,,,, by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. - Filing fee $ 605, receipt number ASCDC-11918394. The Docketing Statement form, Transcript Order form and CJA 24 form may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov (Ashmore, Beattie)
Related: [-]