Original Case: 1:21-cv-03798

Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-cv.pr-01684
Typecivil private / private
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Case Filed:Jul 24, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Jul 25, 2024 5:52 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellant
PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By
Zachary Andrew McEntyre
KING & SPALDING LLP
contact info
Paul Alessio Mezzina
KING & SPALDING LLP
contact info
Amy R. Upshaw
KING & SPALDING LLP
contact info
Jeffrey Cashdan
KING & SPALDING LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
LYNN FREEMAN, on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated
Represented By
Edwin Lee Lowther III
CARNEY BATES & PULLIAM PLLC
contact info
Jacob Lawrence Phillips
JACOBSON PHILLIPS PLLC
contact info
Joseph Henry Bates III
CARNEY BATES & PULLIAM PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/25/2024 4:27 AM EDT
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
1 1 1 pgs Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:21-cv-03798-DCC. Case manager: KHancock. [1001606616] 24-1684 KH [Entered: 07/24/2024 04:18 PM]
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs Case transferred from miscellaneous docket 24-177. Record complete? Yes. [1001606627] 24-1684 KH [Entered: 07/24/2024 04:25 PM]
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs FEE NOTICE issued to Progressive Direct Insurance Company - after grant of permission to appeal. Originating case number: 1:21-cv-03798-DCC. [1001606634] 24-1684 KH [Entered: 07/24/2024 04:30 PM]
Related: [-]
4 4 7 pgs DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case. Originating case number: 1:21-cv-03798-DCC. [1001606640] 24-1684 KH [Entered: 07/24/2024 04:32 PM]
Related: [-]