Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 6:19-bk-05398

Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Karen S Jennemann
Case #: 6:21-ap-00158
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Nov 29, 2021
Terminated:Jul 12, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Global Paving & Maintenance, LLC d/b/a Sunray Paving & Construction Company
220 N Rosalind Ave.
Orlando, FL 32801
Represented By
Global Paving & Maintenance, LLC d/b/a Sunray Paving & Construction Company
contact info
Plaintiff
Gene T Chambers
Post Office Box 533987
Orlando, FL 32853
Represented By
Rosemary Hanna Hayes
Hayes Law, Pl
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Tuesday, March 21, 2023
21 21 misc Stipulation (AP) Tue 03/21 4:32 PM
Joint Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice Filed by Carly Marie Newman on behalf of Plaintiff Gene T Chambers. (Newman, Carly)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 12, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Tue 07/12 8:41 AM
Adversary Case 6:21-ap-158 Closed. (Adrienne)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 10, 2022
court Compromise Cross-Reference Tue 05/10 2:22 PM
Order Granting Motion to Approve Compromise filed in Case No. 6:19-bk-05398-LVV . (Lisa P.)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 11, 2022
20 20 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Mon 04/11 4:50 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Pltf Atty: Rosemary Hayes Def Atty: April Rocke RULING: Chambers v. Global Paving & Maintenance, LLC Pretrial Conference - No Further Action pending settlement agreement. (aj) Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Bill)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 06, 2022
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 04/07 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 04/06/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #18 )
Monday, April 04, 2022
18 18 2 pgs order Order Establishing Procedures for Video Hearings and Registration Link to Appear via Zoom Mon 04/04 12:30 PM
Order Establishing Procedures for Video Hearings and Registration Link to Appear via Zoom. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. NG -(ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
court Compromise Cross-Reference Mon 04/04 9:01 AM
Motion to Approve Compromise filed in Case No. 6:19-bk-5398-LVV Doc. #569 . (Susan B.)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 25, 2022
17 17 motion Motion to Extend Time (AP) Fri 03/25 2:13 PM
Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Second Amended Complaint Filed by Rosemary Hanna Hayes on behalf of Plaintiff Gene T Chambers Related [+]. (Hayes, Rosemary)
Related: [-] 15
Thursday, March 17, 2022
16 16 misc Proof of Service (AP) Thu 03/17 11:49 AM
Proof of Service of Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Filed by April A Rocke on behalf of Defendant Global Paving & Maintenance, LLC d/b/a Sunray Paving & Construction Company Related [+]. (Rocke, April)
Related: [-] 15
Monday, March 07, 2022
15 15 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Mon 03/07 1:04 PM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Related [+]. Service Instructions: April Rocke is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Danielle H.)
Related: [-] 7
Wednesday, March 02, 2022
14 14 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Wed 03/02 11:01 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Pltf Atty: Rosemary Hayes; Carly Newman Def Atty: April Rocke RULING: Pretrial Conference - Continued to 4/11/22 at 2:00pm (AOCNFNG) 1) Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Doc #7) - Response by Plaintiff (Doc #8) - Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Response (Doc #10) - Granted; plaintiff to amend complaint on or before 3/25/22; response due 10 days thereafter. Order by Rocke. (aj) Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Bill)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 18, 2022
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 02/19 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 02/18/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #11 )
Wednesday, February 16, 2022
12 12 misc Disclosure (BK) Wed 02/16 3:14 PM
Disclosure Global's Rule 26(a) Disclosures Filed by April A Rocke on behalf of Defendant Global Paving & Maintenance, LLC d/b/a Sunray Paving & Construction Company. (Rocke, April)
Related: [-]
11 11 2 pgs order Order Establishing Procedures for Video Hearings and Registration Link to Appear via Zoom Wed 02/16 2:30 PM
Order Establishing Procedures for Video Hearings and Registration Link to Appear via Zoom. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. NG -(ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 15, 2022
10 10 answer Reply Tue 02/15 1:20 PM
Reply to the Trustee's Response in Opposition to Global's Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding and Enforce Settlement Filed by April A Rocke on behalf of Defendant Global Paving & Maintenance, LLC d/b/a Sunray Paving & Construction Company Related [+]. (Rocke, April)
Related: [-] 7
Monday, February 07, 2022
9 9 court Notice Canceling and/or Rescheduling (AP) Mon 02/07 3:23 PM
Notice Rescheduling Hearing . Hearing scheduled for 3/2/2022 at 01:30 PM at Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6C, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street. (Aimee)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 04, 2022
assign Assign Judge to Electronically Filed Cases Fri 02/04 8:35 AM
Assignment of the Honorable Lori V. Vaughan, Bankruptcy Judge to this case . (Kathy D.)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 24, 2022
8 8 answer Response Mon 01/24 4:23 PM
Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding and Enforce Settlement Filed by Rosemary Hanna Hayes on behalf of Plaintiff Gene T Chambers Related [+]. (Hayes, Rosemary)
Related: [-] 7
Monday, January 10, 2022
7 7 motion Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Mon 01/10 4:18 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding and Enforce Settlement Filed by April A Rocke on behalf of Defendant Global Paving & Maintenance, LLC d/b/a Sunray Paving & Construction Company. (Rocke, April)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 21, 2021
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 12/21 2:33 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by April A Rocke on behalf of Defendant Global Paving & Maintenance, LLC d/b/a Sunray Paving & Construction Company. (Rocke, April)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 02, 2021
5 5 misc Summons Service Executed Thu 12/02 9:43 AM
Service Executed on Global Paving & Maintenance, LLC dba Sunray Paving & Construction Company of Summons, Complaint, Local Rule 7001-1. Filed by Rosemary Hanna Hayes on behalf of Plaintiff Gene T Chambers Related [+]. (Hayes, Rosemary)
Related: [-] 4
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 12/02 9:25 AM
Amended Complaint against Global Paving & Maintenance, LLC Nature of Suit: 14 Related [+] by Rosemary Hanna Hayes on behalf of Gene T Chambers against Global Paving & Maintenance, LLC d/b/a Sunray Paving & Construction Company.. (Hayes, Rosemary) Modified on 12/2/2021 (Hill, Rutha)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - other1
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Cashier's Check
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Invoice
Tuesday, November 30, 2021
3 3 misc Summons Service Executed Tue 11/30 1:24 PM
Service Executed on Global Paving & Maintenance, LLC dba Sunray Paving & Construction Company of Summons, Complaint, Local Rule 7001-1. Filed by Rosemary Hanna Hayes on behalf of Plaintiff Gene T Chambers. (Hayes, Rosemary)
Related: [-]
2 2 court ADI - Summons Issued (auto) Tue 11/30 12:30 PM
Summons issued on Global Paving and Maintenance, LLC d/b/a Sunray Paving and Construction Company along with Local Rule 7001-1 - Adversary Proceedings - Procedures. Answer Due 12/30/2021. If one or more defendants are the United States or an officer or agency thereof, add an additional five days to the Answer Due date. A Pretrial/Status Conference will be held on March 10, 2022, at null AM. A copy of this summons must be included when filing proof of service of this summons. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 29, 2021
1 1 cmp ADI - Complaint - Original Mon 11/29 3:34 PM
Complaint by Gene T Chambers against Global Paving & Maintenance, LLC d/b/a Sunray Paving & Construction Company. Filing Fee Deferred. Nature of Suit: [14 Related [+]]. (Hayes, Rosemary) Modified on 11/30/2021 (Grammel, Laura)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - other
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Cashier's Check
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Invoice