Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Lori V Vaughan
Case #: 6:19-bk-05398
Case Filed:Aug 16, 2019
Creditor Meeting:Aug 31, 2020
Claims Deadline:Sep 22, 2020
Converted:Jul 14, 2020

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
J.E.L. Site Development, Inc.
7090 Astro St
Winter Park, FL 32792-6602
Represented By
Scott S Sheffler
Worman & Sheffler, P.A.
contact info
Robert B Branson
Bransonlaw PLLC
contact info
Jacob D Flentke
Flentke Legal Consulting, PLLC
contact info
Jeffrey Ainsworth
Bransonlaw PLLC
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Gene T Chambers
Gene T. Chambers, P.A., Trustee 377 Maitland Ave Ste 1002
Altamonte Springs, FL 32701
Represented By
Carly Marie Newman
Hayes & Newman, Pl
contact info
Jon E Kane
Nardella & Nardella PLLC
contact info
Rosemary Hanna Hayes
Hayes Law, Pl
contact info
Kristen Henkel
M.E. Henkel, P.A.
contact info
Michael A Nardella
Nardella & Nardella, PLLC
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee - ORL
Office of the United States Trustee George C Young Federal Building 400 West Washington Street, Suite 1100
Orlando, FL 32801
Represented By
Miriam G Suarez
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/13/2025 12:42 PM EST
Friday, August 16, 2019
crditcrd Receipt of Filing Fee Fri 08/16 12:29 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(6:19-bk-05398) [misc,volp11a2] (1717.00). Receipt Number 61637525, Amount Paid $1717.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
court Notice to Debtor(s) Attorney Regarding Local Rule 2081-1 (Paperless Entry) Fri 08/16 9:00 PM
Debtor(s) Attorney and Unrepresented Debtor(s) are directed to comply with all requirements set forth in Local Rule 2081-1. The Court's Local Rule can be found at[LINK:http://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/localrules/rules/2081-1.pdf] . (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Fri 08/16 12:21 PM
Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. (Verify Fee). Schedules and Statements Incomplete, Statement of Financial Affairs Not Filed or Incomplete, Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Not Filed or Not Required, Filed by Jeffrey Ainsworth on behalf of J.E.L. Site Development, Inc.. (Ainsworth, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice Of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 08/16 12:23 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice as Additional Counsel for Purposes of CM/ECF Filed by Robert B Branson on behalf of Debtor J.E.L. Site Development, Inc.. (Branson, Robert)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice Of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 08/16 4:01 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Kenneth D Herron Jr on behalf of Creditor United Financial Group, Inc.. (Herron, Kenneth)
Related: [-]