Utah District Court
Judge:Jill N Parrish
Referred: Cecilia M Romero
Case #: 2:21-cv-00706
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12132 Americans with Disabilities Act - Discrimination
Case Filed:Dec 01, 2021
Terminated:Mar 31, 2023
Last checked: Monday May 30, 2022 3:02 AM MDT
Defendant
Salt Lake City School District
Represented By
Matthew S. Brahana
Fabian Vancott
contact info
Joan M. Andrews
Fabian Vancott
contact info
Defendant
Salt Lake City School District Board of Education
Represented By
Matthew S. Brahana
Fabian Vancott
contact info
Joan M. Andrews
Fabian Vancott
contact info
Plaintiff
Disability Law Center
Represented By
Nathaniel J. Crippes
Disability Law Center
contact info
Laura K. Henrie
Disability Law Center
contact info
Michelle C. Marquis
Disability Law Center
contact info
Katie M. Cox
Disability Law Center
contact info
Maya Violet Anderson
Disability Law Center
contact info
Plaintiff
Kristin Jacobs
Represented By
Nathaniel J. Crippes
Disability Law Center
contact info
Laura K. Henrie
Disability Law Center
contact info
Michelle C. Marquis
Disability Law Center
contact info
Katie M. Cox
Disability Law Center
contact info
Maya Violet Anderson
Disability Law Center
contact info
Plaintiff
Amanda Sandy
Represented By
Nathaniel J. Crippes
Disability Law Center
contact info
Laura K. Henrie
Disability Law Center
contact info
Michelle C. Marquis
Disability Law Center
contact info
Katie M. Cox
Disability Law Center
contact info
Maya Violet Anderson
Disability Law Center
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Timothy Gadson
Terminated: 03/15/2022
Defendant
Nicole Suchey
Terminated: 03/15/2022

GPO Mar 31 2023
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 32 Motion to Dismiss: The court dismisses the plaintiffs' Section 504 claim without prejudice for failure to exhaust administrative remedies. The court dismisses the plaintiffs' IDEA and ADA claims for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 3/31/23. (dle)

Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Wednesday, May 31, 2023
appeal Appeal Record Complete Notice Wed 05/31 2:49 PM
Please be advised the Record is complete for purposes of appeal for USCA case number 23-4058 re52 Notice of Appeal. (dle)
Related: [-]