Original Case: 2:21-cv-00706

Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cv-04058
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Case Filed:May 01, 2023
Last checked: Thursday May 04, 2023 2:22 AM MDT
Defendant - Appellee
SALT LAKE CITY SCHOOL DISTRICT
Represented By
Matthew S. Brahana
Fabian VanCott
contact info
Joan M. Andrews
Fabian VanCott
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
BOARD OF EDUCATION OF SALT LAKE CITY SCHOOLS
Represented By
Matthew S. Brahana
Fabian VanCott
contact info
Joan M. Andrews
Fabian VanCott
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
KRISTIN JACOBS, legal guardian of E.J.
Represented By
Katie M. Cox
Disability Law Center
contact info
Michelle Marquis
Disability Law Center
contact info
Maya Violet Anderson
Disability Law Center
contact info
Laura K. Henrie
Disability Law Center
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
AMANDA SANDY, legal guardian of H.S.
Represented By
Katie M. Cox
Disability Law Center
contact info
Michelle Marquis
Disability Law Center
contact info
Maya Violet Anderson
Disability Law Center
contact info
Laura K. Henrie
Disability Law Center
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
DISABILITY LAW CENTER
Represented By
Katie M. Cox
Disability Law Center
contact info
Michelle Marquis
Disability Law Center
contact info
Maya Violet Anderson
Disability Law Center
contact info
Laura K. Henrie
Disability Law Center
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/04/2023 2:22 AM MDT
Monday, May 01, 2023
[10995574] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 05/01/2023. Notice of appearance, transcript order form and docketing statement due 05/15/2023 for Disability Law Center, Kristin Jacobs and Amanda Sandy. Disclosure statement due on 05/15/2023 for Disability Law Center. Notice of appearance due on 05/15/2023 for Board of Education of Salt Lake City Schools and Salt Lake City School District. 23-4058
Related: [-]
Att: 1 30 pgs Main Document
Att: 2 2 pgs General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil