California Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Christopher M Klein
Case #: 2:21-bk-24045
Case Filed:Dec 01, 2021
Creditor Meeting:Feb 17, 2022
Claims Deadline:Apr 11, 2022

Debtor
Wulff Electric, Inc.
820 Eubanks Dr Ste A
Vacaville, CA 95688-8837
Represented By
Joan M. Chipser
Joan Chipser, Attorney At Law
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Susan K. Smith
2701 Del Paso Road, Suite 130-PMB 399
Sacramento, CA 95835
Represented By
J. Russell Cunningham
contact info
Benjamin C. Tagert
contact info
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee
Robert T Matsui United States Courthouse 501 I Street, Room 7-500
Sacramento, CA 95814


Docket last updated: 02/20/2025 5:57 AM PST
Wednesday, December 01, 2021
misc EFILED RECEIPT - Voluntary Petition Fee Paid (7) [ADI] Wed 12/01 3:02 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition (Filing Fee Paid: $338.00, Receipt Number: 373048, eFilingID: 7041527) (auto)
Related: [-]
1 1 4 pgs misc Voluntary Petition 7 - Case Upload Wed 12/01 2:52 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual filed. (Fee Paid $338.00) (Joan M. Chipser) (eFilingID: 7041527)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility First Meeting - 7 Business Asset Wed 12/01 2:53 PM
Meeting of Creditors to be held on 12/29/2021 at 02:00 PM. See our website for location. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Appointment of Interim Trustee - Including Amended Appointment (Produces Form) Wed 12/01 2:58 PM
Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Susan K. Smith (auto)
Related: [-]
4 4 58 pgs misc Master Address List Wed 12/01 3:34 PM
Master Address List (auto)
Related: [-]
5 5 Summary of Schedules/Assets and Liabilities Schedule A/B Schedule D Schedule E/F Schedule G Schedule H Non-Individual (lars)
Related: [-]
6 6 Statement of Financial Affairs Non-Individual (lars)
Related: [-]
7 7 Disclosure of Attorney Compensation (lars)
Related: [-]
8 8 Statement Regarding Ownership of Corporate Debtor/Party (lars)
Related: [-]
9 9 Support Document/Consent to Action Taken in Lieu of Special Meeting of the Directors of Wulff Electric, Inc. Re:1 Voluntary Petition Filed by Debtor Wulff Electric, Inc. (lars)
Related: [-]