Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:21-bk-24045

California Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Christopher M Klein
Case #: 2:23-ap-02018
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Feb 06, 2023
Terminated:Jul 29, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Rexel USA, Inc.
Represented By
Unknown at time of filing
contact info
Plaintiff
Susan K. Smith
Represented By
J. Russell Cunningham
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Monday, August 05, 2024
129 129 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Mon 08/05 2:26 PM
Certificate/Proof of Service of128 Notice of Entry [DNL-3] (mfrs)
Related: [-]
128 128 notice Entry Mon 08/05 2:25 PM
Notice of Entry of124 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding/Notice of Removal [DNL-3] (mfrs)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
utility Close Adversary Proceeding Mon 07/29 5:39 PM
Adversary Proceeding 2:23-ap-2018 Closed (mfrs)
Related: [-]