Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Anthony J Trenga
Referred: William E Fitzpatrick
Case #: 1:21-cv-01377
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Civil Rights Violation
Case Filed:Dec 10, 2021
Terminated:Jul 31, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 08, 2022 4:48 AM EDT
Defendant
Merrick Garland
Represented By
Yuri Fuchs
Us Attorney'S Office (alexandria)
contact info
Rebecca S. Levenson
Us Attorney'S Office (alexandria)
contact info
Plaintiff
Lisa Barnhill
2635 Mesilla Acres Road
Las Cruces, NM 88005
Represented By
Marc Eric Pasekoff
Kalijarvi Chuzi Newman & Fitch PC
contact info
Mary E. Kuntz
Kalijarvi Chuzi Newman & Fitch PC
contact info
Richard Randolph Renner
Kalijarvi, Chuzi & Newman & Fitch, P.C.
contact info
Marc Pasekoff
Shannon Mullins & Wright
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 15, 2025
88 88 appeal USCA Judgment Thu 05/15 10:05 AM
USCA JUDGMENT as to68 Notice of Appeal filed by Lisa Barnhill. In accordance with the decision of this court, the judgment of the district court is affirmed. This judgment shall take effect upon issuance of this court's mandate in accordance with Fed. R. App. P. 41. (swil)
Related: [-]
87 87 appeal USCA Opinion Thu 05/15 9:54 AM
Published Opinion of USCA, decided 5/15/2025 re68 Notice of Appeal - AFFIRMED. (swil)
Related: [-]