Original Case: 1:21-cv-01377

Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cv.us-01901
Typecivil u.s. / united states
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Case Filed:Aug 29, 2023
Terminated:May 15, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 16, 2025 10:16 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
MERRICK B. GARLAND, U.S. Attorney General
Represented By
Yuri S. Fuchs
OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY
contact info
Rebecca Sara Levenson
OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY
contact info
Hugham Chan
OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
PAMELA JO BONDI, U.S. Attorney General
Represented By
Yuri S. Fuchs
OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
LISA BARNHILL
Represented By
Mary E. Kuntz
LIPPMAN, SEMSKER & SALB, PLLC
contact info
Richard Randolph Renner
KALIJARVI, CHUZI, NEWMAN & FITCH, PC
contact info
Jacob M. Small
J. MADISON PLC
contact info

GPO May 15 2025
PUBLISHED AUTHORED OPINION filed. Originating case number: 1:21-cv-01377-AJT-WEF. [1001770849] [23-1901]

Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 10:15 AM EDT
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
1 1 1 pgs Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:21-cv-01377-AJT-WEF. Case manager: AWalker. [1001429676] 23-1901 AW [Entered: 08/29/2023 03:45 PM]
Related: [-]
2 2 7 pgs DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case. Originating case number: 1:21-cv-01377-AJT-WEF. Mailed to: Kuntz. [1001429688] 23-1901 AW [Entered: 08/29/2023 03:56 PM]
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Kuntz. No paper copies required unless case has been tentatively calendared or copies otherwise ordered. All filings must comply with Appendix Pagination & Brief Citation Guide. [1001429694] Opening Brief and Appendix due 10/10/2023. Response Brief due 11/07/2023 23-1901 AW [Entered: 08/29/2023 04:00 PM]
Related: [-]