Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-12269

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Craig T Goldblatt
Case #: 1:21-ap-51413
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Dec 17, 2021
Terminated:Mar 03, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Sfunhiro Operations LLC
Represented By
Sfunhiro Operations LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
RPA Asset Management Services, LLC, Trustee of the MDC Litigation Trust
Represented By
Frederick Brian Rosner
The Rosner Law Group LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Thursday, March 03, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Thu 03/03 10:24 AM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-51413 Closed (NR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 02, 2022
8 8 notice Dismissal - Notice Wed 03/02 4:41 PM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by RPA Asset Management Services, LLC (Gibson, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 18, 2022
7 7 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Fri 02/18 9:46 AM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by RPA Asset Management Services, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 2/18/2022 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Fu, Michelle)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Adv) Fri 02/18 9:10 AM
Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by RPA Asset Management Services, LLC Hearing scheduled for 2/18/2022 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Fu, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 16, 2022
5 5 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Adv) Wed 02/16 11:59 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by RPA Asset Management Services, LLC Hearing scheduled for 2/18/2022 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Fu, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 14, 2022
4 4 cmp Amended Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Fri 01/14 7:48 PM
Amended Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Sfunhiro Operations LLC. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 2/18/2022 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Gibson, Jason)
Related: [-] ument1 ,3
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Monday, January 10, 2022
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Mon 01/10 10:07 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Sfunhiro Operations LLC. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 1/18/2022 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Rosner, Frederick)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Friday, December 17, 2021
2 2 crditcrd none Fri 12/17 5:43 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 21-51413 CTG] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number A10591308, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Fri 12/17 4:27 PM
Adversary case 21-51413 Complaint by RPA Asset Management Services, LLC against Sfunhiro Operations LLC. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 3/17/2022. (Rosner, Frederick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A