Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-12269

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Craig T Goldblatt
Case #: 1:21-ap-51416
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Dec 20, 2021
Terminated:Apr 12, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Chase Harris, Inc.
Represented By
Chase Harris, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
RPA Asset Management Services, LLC, Trustee of the MDC Litigation Trust
Represented By
Jason A. Gibson
The Rosner Law Group LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 23 minutes ago
Tuesday, April 12, 2022
9 9 notice Dismissal - Notice Tue 04/12 11:01 AM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by RPA Asset Management Services, LLC (Gibson, Jason)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Tue 04/12 4:12 PM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-51416 Closed (NR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 09, 2022
8 8 misc Withdrawal of Appearance - Notice Wed 03/09 3:47 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance. Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance as Counsel and Request for Removal From Electronic and Paper Noticing Matrix - Michelle M. Fu has withdrawn from the case. Filed by RPA Asset Management Services, LLC. (Fu, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 18, 2022
7 7 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Fri 02/18 9:47 AM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by RPA Asset Management Services, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 2/18/2022 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Fu, Michelle)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Adv) Fri 02/18 9:11 AM
Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by RPA Asset Management Services, LLC Hearing scheduled for 2/18/2022 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Fu, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 16, 2022
5 5 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Adv) Wed 02/16 12:00 PM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by RPA Asset Management Services, LLC Hearing scheduled for 2/18/2022 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Fu, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 18, 2022
4 4 cmp Amended Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Tue 01/18 11:40 PM
Amended Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Chase Harris, Inc.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 2/18/2022 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Gibson, Jason)
Related: [-] ument1 ,3
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Monday, January 10, 2022
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Mon 01/10 10:14 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Chase Harris, Inc.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 2/18/2022 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Gibson, Jason)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Monday, December 20, 2021
2 2 crditcrd none Mon 12/20 9:47 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 21-51416 CTG] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number A10592934, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Mon 12/20 9:47 PM
Adversary case 21-51416 Complaint by RPA Asset Management Services, LLC against Chase Harris, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 3/21/2022. (Gibson, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives