Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Peter D Russin
Case #: 0:21-bk-22012
Case Filed:Dec 28, 2021
Dismissed:Jan 12, 2022
Terminated:Feb 18, 2022

Debtor
Sugar Town LLC
2645 Executive Park Dr Ste 101
Weston, FL 33331-3624
Represented By
Sugar Town LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
Petitioning Creditor
Lucio Medolago Albani
7977 NW 116 Ave
Doral, FL 33178
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130


Docket last updated: 40 minutes ago
Wednesday, March 23, 2022
40 40 notice Notice to Withdraw Document Wed 03/23 5:36 PM
Notice to Withdraw Document Filed by Creditors LaCon Aluminum, LLC, LaCon Realty, LLC Related [+]. (Fernandez, Lara)
Related: [-] 39 Notice of Filing
39 39 notice Notice of Filing Wed 03/23 5:15 PM
Notice of Filing , Filed by Creditors LaCon Aluminum, LLC, LaCon Realty, LLC. (Fernandez, Lara)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 18, 2022
38 38 court Close Bankruptcy Case Fri 02/18 11:10 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (Rodriguez, Lorenzo)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 14, 2022
37 37 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case Sat 01/15 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case Related [+] Notice Date 01/14/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 35 Agreed Order Dismissing With Prejudice Involuntary Bankruptcy Cases . Dismissal Shall Be with prejudice for a 180-day period.. [Filing Fee Balance Due: $0.00] .
Wednesday, January 12, 2022
36 36 attydoc Certificate of Service [Attorney] Wed 01/12 2:07 PM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Eyal Berger Esq. Related [+]. (Berger, Eyal)
Related: [-] 35 Order Dismissing Case
35 35 3 pgs order Order Dismissing Case (Other) Wed 01/12 1:11 PM
Agreed Order Dismissing With Prejudice Involuntary Bankruptcy Cases . Dismissal Shall Be with prejudice for a 180-day period.. [Filing Fee Balance Due: $0.00] . (Rodriguez, Lorenzo)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 07, 2022
34 34 attydoc Certificate of Service [Attorney] Fri 01/07 3:03 PM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Eyal Berger Esq. Related [+]. (Berger, Eyal)
Related: [-] 33 Order on Motion For Relief From Stay
33 33 order Relief from Stay Order Fri 01/07 1:15 PM
Order Granting in part. Motion For Relief From Stay Re: #12 (Rodriguez, Lorenzo)
Related: [-]
32 32 attydoc Certificate of Service [Attorney] Fri 01/07 11:53 AM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Bradley S Shraiberg Related [+]. (Shraiberg, Bradley)
Related: [-] 31 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice
31 31 order Appear pro hac vice Order Fri 01/07 11:40 AM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice Related [+] (Rodriguez, Lorenzo)
Related: [-] #30
Thursday, January 06, 2022
30 30 motion Appear pro hac vice Thu 01/06 1:18 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice by Christine L. Myatt [Fee Paid $200] Filed by Creditor Greater Nevada Credit Union (Shraiberg, Bradley)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Thu 01/06 1:19 PM
Receipt of Motion to Appear pro hac vice 21-22012 PDR) [motion,mprohac] ( 200.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 40278145. Fee amount 200.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 05, 2022
29 29 answer Objection Wed 01/05 9:04 PM
Objection to (12 Expedited Motion for Relief from Stay [Expedited Joint Motion By Secured Creditors And Alleged Debtors For Stay Relief And To Abstain] [Fee Amount $188] filed by Debtor Sugar Town LLC, Debtor Atio USA, LLC,14 Expedited Motion Assignees Motion to Excuse Compliance with Turnover of Property by Custodian Pursuant to 11 USC 543(d)(1) and Request for Expedited Hearing filed by Other Professional Marc Barmat) Filed by Other Professional Estra Aluminium Corporation (Neiwirth, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Exhibit D
28 28 attydoc Certificate of Service [Attorney] Wed 01/05 4:44 PM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Robert C Meyer Related [+]. (Meyer, Robert)
Related: [-] 17 Notice of Hearing
27 27 misc Certificate of Service Wed 01/05 3:41 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Other Professional Marc Barmat Related [+]. (Osborne, Leslie)
Related: [-] 16 Notice of Hearing
26 26 attydoc Certificate of Service [Attorney] Wed 01/05 3:30 PM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Eyal Berger Esq. Related [+]. (Berger, Eyal)
Related: [-] 12 Expedited Motion for Relief from Stay [Expedited Joint Motion By Secured Creditors And Alleged Debtors For Stay Relief And To Abstain] [Fee Amount $188] filed by Debtor Sugar Town LLC, Debtor Atio USA, LLC,18 Notice of Hearing Amended/Renoticed/Continued
25 25 answer Response Wed 01/05 3:03 PM
Opposition Response to (10 Verified Motion to Appoint Trustee (Joined by ATIO creditors) filed by Petitioning Creditor Lucio Medolago Albani) Filed by Debtors Atio USA, LLC, Sugar Town LLC (Berger, Eyal)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Joinder Wed 01/05 1:55 PM
Joinder in Assignee's Motion to Excuse Compliance with Turnover of Property by Custodian Pursuant to 11 USC Section 543(d)(1) Filed by Creditors LaCon Aluminum, LLC, LaCon Realty, LLC Related [+]. (Fernandez, Lara)
Related: [-] 14 Expedited Motion Assignees Motion to Excuse Compliance with Turnover of Property by Custodian Pursuant to 11 USC 543(d)(1) and Request for Expedited Hearing filed by Other Professional Marc Barmat
23 23 misc Joinder Wed 01/05 1:53 PM
Joinder in Expedited Joint Motion by Secured Creditors and Alleged Debtors for Stay Relief and to Abstain Filed by Creditors LaCon Aluminum, LLC, LaCon Realty, LLC Related [+]. (Fernandez, Lara)
Related: [-] 12 Expedited Motion for Relief from Stay [Expedited Joint Motion By Secured Creditors And Alleged Debtors For Stay Relief And To Abstain] [Fee Amount $188] filed by Debtor Sugar Town LLC, Debtor Atio USA, LLC
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service Wed 01/05 1:33 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by David A Nunez Filed by Petitioning Creditor Lucio Medolago Albani. (Nunez, David)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Relief from Stay Wed 01/05 12:43 PM
Motion for Relief from Stay (Joinder in Expedited Joint Motion by Secured Creditors and Alleged Debtors for Stay Relief and to Abstain DE 12) [Fee Amount $188] Filed by Creditor Seacoast Bank (Kirk, Donald)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service Wed 01/05 10:05 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Ronald G Neiwirth Esq. Filed by Other Professional Estra Aluminium Corporation. (Neiwirth, Ronald)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service Wed 01/05 10:02 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Amanda Klopp Filed by Debtors Atio USA, LLC, Sugar Town LLC. (Klopp, Amanda)
Related: [-]
18 18 court Notice of Hearing [Amd/Rntc/Cntd] (BK) Wed 01/05 10:02 AM
Amended Notice of Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 01/06/2022 at 03:00 PM by Video Conference. (Romero, Christina)
Related: [-] 12 Expedited Motion for Relief from Stay [Expedited Joint Motion By Secured Creditors And Alleged Debtors For Stay Relief And To Abstain] [Fee Amount $188] Filed by Debtors Atio USA, LLC, Sugar Town LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Exhibit D # 5 Exhibit E)
17 17 court Notice of Hearing (BK) Wed 01/05 10:00 AM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 01/06/2022 at 03:00 PM by Video Conference. (Romero, Christina)
Related: [-] 10 Verified Motion to Appoint Trustee (Joined by ATIO creditors) Filed by Petitioning Creditor Lucio Medolago Albani
16 16 court Notice of Hearing (BK) Wed 01/05 9:58 AM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 01/06/2022 at 03:00 PM by Video Conference. (Romero, Christina)
Related: [-] 14 Expedited Motion Assignees Motion to Excuse Compliance with Turnover of Property by Custodian Pursuant to 11 USC 543(d)(1) and Request for Expedited Hearing Filed by Other Professional Marc Barmat
15 15 court Notice of Hearing (BK) Wed 01/05 9:57 AM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 01/05/2022 at 03:00 PM by Video Conference. (Romero, Christina)
Related: [-] 12 Expedited Motion for Relief from Stay [Expedited Joint Motion By Secured Creditors And Alleged Debtors For Stay Relief And To Abstain] [Fee Amount $188] Filed by Debtors Atio USA, LLC, Sugar Town LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Exhibit D # 5 Exhibit E)
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Wed 01/05 12:47 PM
Receipt of Motion for Relief From Stay 21-22012 PDR) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 188.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 40270416. Fee amount 188.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 04, 2022
14 14 motion Miscellaneous Motion Tue 01/04 4:40 PM
Expedited Motion Assignees Motion to Excuse Compliance with Turnover of Property by Custodian Pursuant to 11 USC 543(d)(1) and Request for Expedited Hearing Filed by Other Professional Marc Barmat (Osborne, Leslie)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service Tue 01/04 4:37 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Donald R Kirk Esq Filed by Creditor Seacoast Bank. (Kirk, Donald)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Relief from Stay Tue 01/04 4:36 PM
Expedited Motion for Relief from Stay [Expedited Joint Motion By Secured Creditors And Alleged Debtors For Stay Relief And To Abstain] [Fee Amount $188] Filed by Debtors Atio USA, LLC, Sugar Town LLC (Berger, Eyal)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Exhibit D
Att: 5 Exhibit E
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Tue 01/04 4:39 PM
Receipt of Motion for Relief From Stay 21-22012 PDR) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 188.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 40265913. Fee amount 188.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 03, 2022
11 11 attydoc Certificate of Service [Attorney] Mon 01/03 2:29 PM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Robert C Meyer Related [+]. (Meyer, Robert)
Related: [-] 6 Order on Motion For Joint Administration
10 10 17 pgs motion Appoint Trustee Mon 01/03 1:51 PM
Verified Motion to Appoint Trustee (Joined by ATIO creditors) Filed by Petitioning Creditor Lucio Medolago Albani (Meyer, Robert)
Related: [-]
9 9 2 pgs misc Involuntary Summons Service Executed Mon 01/03 1:32 PM
Summons Service Executed in an Involuntary Case on Rozencwaig & Nadel, LLP Filed by Petitioning Creditor Lucio Medolago Albani. Summons Served: 12/29/2021. Answer to Involuntary Summons Due: 1/19/2022. (Meyer, Robert)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service Mon 01/03 1:25 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Lara R Fernandez Filed by Creditors LaCon Realty, LLC, LaCon Aluminum, LLC. (Fernandez, Lara)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 31, 2021
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 01/01 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 12/31/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued on Debtor Sugar Town LLC in an Involuntary Case.
Thursday, December 30, 2021
6 6 order Joint Administration Order Thu 12/30 4:45 PM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration on Case 0:2021-bk-22012-PDR Related [+] Member case 2021-22014 (Rodriguez, Lorenzo)
Related: [-] #5
Wednesday, December 29, 2021
5 5 3 pgs motion Joint Administration Wed 12/29 3:23 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Jointly Administer Case(s) 21-22014 into Lead Case 21-22012 Filed by Petitioning Creditor Lucio Medolago Albani (Meyer, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
4 4 notice Notice to Withdraw Document Wed 12/29 3:21 PM
Notice to Withdraw Document Filed by Petitioning Creditor Lucio Medolago Albani Related [+]. (Meyer, Robert)
Related: [-] 3 Motion to Consolidate Cases
3 3 motion Consolidate Cases Wed 12/29 1:12 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Consolidate Case(s) 21-22014 into Lead Case 21-22012 Filed by Petitioning Creditor Lucio Medolago Albani (Meyer, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
2 2 court Summons Issued [Involuntary] Wed 12/29 9:57 AM
Summons Issued on Debtor Sugar Town LLC in an Involuntary Case. (Rodriguez, Lorenzo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 28, 2021
1 1 4 pgs misc Involuntary Petition (Chapter 11) Tue 12/28 2:43 PM
Chapter 11 Involuntary Petition Re: Sugar Town LLC Filed by Petitioning Creditor(s) Lucio Medolago Albani (Meyer, Robert)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Tue 12/28 2:44 PM
Receipt of Involuntary Petition (Chapter 11) 21-22012 [misc,invol11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 40237616. Fee amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]