Member Case
Lead case is: 0:21-bk-22012

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Peter D Russin
Case #: 0:21-bk-22014
Case Filed:Dec 28, 2021
Dismissed:Jan 24, 2022
Terminated:Feb 18, 2022

Debtor
ATIO USA LLC
3055 Evercane Rd
Clewiston, FL 33440
Represented By
ATIO USA LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
Petitioning Creditor
Elettro2000 SRI (Gruppo Pedercini)
Represented By
Robert C Meyer
contact info
Petitioning Creditor
Facoba SRI Credit
Represented By
Robert C Meyer
contact info
Petitioning Creditor
Epsilon Metalli SRI Credit
Represented By
Robert C Meyer
contact info
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130


Docket last updated: 30 minutes ago
Friday, February 18, 2022
17 17 court Close Bankruptcy Case Fri 02/18 11:11 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (Rodriguez, Lorenzo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 26, 2022
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case Thu 01/27 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case Related [+] Notice Date 01/26/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Agreed Order Dismissing With Prejudice Involuntary Bankruptcy Cases . Dismissal Shall Be with prejudice for a 180-day period. [Filing Fee Balance Due: $0.00] .
Monday, January 24, 2022
15 15 3 pgs order Order Dismissing Case (Other) Mon 01/24 12:00 PM
Agreed Order Dismissing With Prejudice Involuntary Bankruptcy Cases . Dismissal Shall Be with prejudice for a 180-day period. [Filing Fee Balance Due: $0.00] . (Rodriguez, Lorenzo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 04, 2022
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service Tue 01/04 4:41 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Donald R Kirk Esq Filed by Creditor Seacoast Bank. (Kirk, Donald)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 03, 2022
13 13 misc Involuntary Summons Service Executed Mon 01/03 1:39 PM
Summons Service Executed in an Involuntary Case on Santos & Company, PA Filed by Petitioning Creditors Elettro2000 SRI (Gruppo Pedercini), Epsilon Metalli SRI Credit, Facoba SRI Credit. Summons Served: 12/29/2021. Answer to Involuntary Summons Due: 1/19/2022. (Meyer, Robert)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service Mon 01/03 1:23 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Lara R Fernandez Filed by Creditors LaCon Realty, LLC, LaCon Aluminum, LLC. (Fernandez, Lara)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 01, 2022
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 01/02 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 01/01/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Summons Issued on Debtor ATIO USA LLC in an Involuntary Case.
Friday, December 31, 2021
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 01/01 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 12/31/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Summons Issued on Debtor ATIO USA LLC in an Involuntary Case.
Thursday, December 30, 2021
9 9 3 pgs order Order (Generic) Thu 12/30 4:51 PM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration on Case 0:2021-bk-22012-PDR Related [+] Member case 2021-22014. (Rodriguez, Lorenzo)
Related: [-] # 5
8 8 court Summons Issued [Involuntary] Thu 12/30 8:46 AM
Summons Issued on Debtor ATIO USA LLC in an Involuntary Case. (Rodriguez, Lorenzo)
Related: [-]
utility Utility - Jointly Administered Cases Thu 12/30 4:52 PM
Jointly Administered Case (Rodriguez, Lorenzo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 29, 2021
7 7 court Summons Issued [Involuntary] Wed 12/29 1:21 PM
Summons Issued on Debtor ATIO USA LLC in an Involuntary Case. (Adam, Lorraine)
Related: [-]
6 6 court Case Reassigned [Judge] Wed 12/29 12:42 PM
*Entered in Error* Judge Mindy A Mora added to case. Involvement of Judge Peter D. Russin Terminated (Adam, Lorraine) Modified on 12/29/2021 (Adam, Lorraine)
Related: [-]
5 5 court Case Reassigned [Judge] Wed 12/29 12:39 PM
Judge Peter D. Russin added to case. Involvement of Judge Mindy A Mora Terminated (Adam, Lorraine) Modified on 12/29/2021 (Adam, Lorraine)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Notice of Judge Reassignment (After Order) re: Recusal, Intra District Transfer Wed 12/29 12:38 PM
Notice of Intra-District Transfer. Judge Peter D Russin Assigned to Case. Judge Mindy A Mora Removed from Case. (Adam, Lorraine)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs order Order Transferring Bankruptcy Case (Intra-District) Wed 12/29 12:35 PM
Ex Parte Order Granting Motion to Transfer Case to Affiliated Case. (Adam, Lorraine)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 28, 2021
2 2 3 pgs motion Transfer Case (Intra-District) Tue 12/28 4:25 PM
Motion to Transfer Case To Fort Lauderdale Division Filed by Petitioning Creditors Elettro2000 SRI (Gruppo Pedercini), Epsilon Metalli SRI Credit, Facoba SRI Credit (Meyer, Robert) Title Modified on 12/29/2021 (Adam, Lorraine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
1 1 5 pgs misc Involuntary Petition (Chapter 11) Tue 12/28 2:54 PM
Chapter 11 Involuntary Petition Re: ATIO USA LLC Filed by Petitioning Creditor(s) Elettro2000 SRI (Gruppo Pedercini), Facoba SRI Credit, Epsilon Metalli SRI Credit (Meyer, Robert) Modified on 12/29/2021 to restrict and replace interactive PDF (Adam, Lorraine)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Tue 12/28 2:55 PM
Receipt of Involuntary Petition (Chapter 11) 21-22014 [misc,invol11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 40237700. Fee amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]