Idaho Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Noah G Hillen
Case #: 1:21-bk-00737
Case Filed:Dec 28, 2021
Creditor Meeting:Sep 13, 2022
Claims Deadline:Jul 26, 2022
Converted:May 17, 2022
Discharge Objection Deadline:Aug 15, 2022

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
IM Services Group, LLC
5418 N Eagle Rd Ste 160
Boise, ID 83713-0100
Represented By
Chad Moody
Johnson May
contact info
Matthew Todd Christensen
Johnson May, PLLC
contact info
Last checked: never
Creditor Committee
The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Holland & Hart LLP P.O. Box 2527
Boise, ID 83701
Represented By
Robert A Faucher
contact info
Sherilyn A. Olsen
Holland & Hart LLP
contact info
Philip John Griffin
Holland & Hart LLP
contact info
Tara Martens Miller
Holland & Hart LLP
contact info
Trustee
Timothy R. Kurtz
Chapter 7 Trustee PO Box 956
Boise, ID 83702
Represented By
John F Kurtz, Jr
Kurtz Law PLLC
contact info
Timothy R. Kurtz
contact info
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Washington Group Central Plaza 720 Park Blvd, Ste 220
Boise, ID 83712
Represented By
Brett R Cahoon
Doj-Ust
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/21/2023 10:23 AM MDT
Tuesday, December 28, 2021
1 1 163 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Tue 12/28 5:18 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by IM Services Group, LLC Chapter 11 Plan Small Business due by 06/27/2022. Disclosure Statement due by 06/27/2022. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Tue 12/28 5:19 PM
Disclosure of Compensation by Matthew T. Christensen 7213 Filed by Debtor IM Services Group, LLC. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
3 3 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Tue 12/28 5:23 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 21-00737 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A7864930. Fee amount 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
4 4 3 pgs misc 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Tue 12/28 5:27 PM
Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non-Individual: List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders Filed by Debtor IM Services Group, LLC. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
5 5 17 pgs motion Employ (Do Not Use to Employ/Appoint an Examiner) Tue 12/28 5:28 PM
Application to Employ Matthew T. Christensen/Johnson May as Counsel for the Estate . Filed by Debtor IM Services Group, LLC Objections due by 01/21/2022. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Verified Statement of Counsel