Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:21-bk-00737

Idaho Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Noah G Hillen
Case #: 1:23-ap-06038
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Dec 08, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Henry Alec Mclarty
9418 N Winterwood Lane
Garden City, ID 83714
Represented By
Henry Alec Mclarty
contact info
Defendant
K4 Family Trust
9418 N Winterwood Lane
Garden City, ID 83714
Represented By
K4 Family Trust
contact info
Defendant
K4 Services LLC
1266 W Paces Ferry Rd #227
Atlanta, GA 30327
Represented By
K4 Services LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Timothy R. Kurtz, PL
P.O. Box 956
Boise, ID 83701
Represented By
John F Kurtz, Jr
Kurtz Law PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
40 40 utility Status Request Fri 05/09 12:58 PM
Request to the Plaintiff and Defendant's to provide an update on case status. Status request due date 5/23/2025. (krm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
39 39 notice Notice Wed 03/26 3:16 PM
Notice re: Status of Judicial Settlement Conference. Related [+] Filed by. (sjh)
Related: [-] 38 Order Vacating Hearing38 Order Vacating Hearing and Referring Adversary Proceeding to Settlement Judge. Signed on 1/28/2025 (RE: related document(s)26 Order re Pretrial Proceedings Setting Date for Trial,37 Stipulation filed by Defendant Henry Alec McLarty, Defendant K4 Services LLC, Defendant K4 Family Trust). (sjh)
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
38 38 order Vacating Hearing Tue 01/28 2:58 PM
Order Vacating Hearing and Referring Adversary Proceeding to Settlement Judge. Signed on 1/28/2025 Related [+]. (sjh)
Related: [-] 26 Order re Pretrial Proceedings Setting Date for Trial,37 Stipulation filed by Defendant Henry Alec McLarty, Defendant K4 Services LLC, Defendant K4 Family Trust
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
37 37 motion Stipulation Tue 12/17 11:26 AM
Stipulation Between Plaintiff and Defendants for Judicial Settlement Conference Filed by Defendants K4 Family Trust, K4 Services LLC, Henry Alec McLarty. (Geile, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
36 36 notice Notice Thu 11/14 4:08 PM
Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoenas Filed by Plaintiff Timothy R. Kurtz. (Kurtz, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
35 35 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 09/27 3:11 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Defendants K4 Family Trust, K4 Services LLC, Henry Alec McLarty, Henry Alec Mclarty (Geile, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
34 34 court Minute Entry Hearing Held (Other) Mon 09/23 10:48 AM
Hearing Held Appearances: John Kurtz, Attorney for Plaintiff; Patrick Geile, Attorney for Defendants Report of Proceedings: Status Hearing regarding Consent. An amended complaint has been submitted. An answer is forthcoming with consent. No additional Status Conference is needed. Audio File Location: Zoom-Telephone Related [+] (mb)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Timothy R. Kurtz
Friday, August 16, 2024
33 33 notice Notice Fri 08/16 4:03 PM
Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoenas Filed by Plaintiff Timothy R. Kurtz. (Kurtz, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
32 32 cmp Complaint (Amended) Wed 08/14 1:46 PM
Amended Complaint by John F Kurtz Jr on behalf of Timothy R. Kurtz against all defendants. (Kurtz, John)
Related: [-]
Sunday, August 04, 2024
31 31 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Stipulated Order Sun 08/04 10:21 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Stipulated Order Notice Date 08/04/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
30 30 order Stipulated Order Fri 08/02 12:26 PM
Order Granting Stipulation to File First Amended Complaint Related [+] Signed on 8/2/2024. (krm)
Related: [-] 29
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
29 29 motion Stipulation Tue 07/16 5:59 PM
Stipulation Between Parties [and Proposed Order] to File First Amended Complaint Filed by Plaintiff Timothy R. Kurtz Related [+]. (Kurtz, John)
Related: [-] 27 Motion to Amend Complaint (related document(s)1 Complaint) Complaint
Att: 1 Exhibit Exh A - First Amended Complaint
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
28 28 misc Minute Entry Hearing Continued Tue 07/09 1:01 PM
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Appearances: John Kurtz, Attorney for Plaintiff; Patrick Geile, Attorney for Defendants Report of Proceedings: After discussion with Counsel, the Court CONTINUES today's status hearing to September 23, 2024, at 10:00 a.m. via telephonic hearing to give Parties additional time to finalize a Complaint and Answer. Parties shall call the Judge Hillen's Conference Number: 1-669-254-5252, and enter Meeting ID: 160-5422-0978. Audio File Location: Zoom-Telephone Status hearing to be held on 9/23/2024 at 10:00 AM at Telephonic Hearing. (ad)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
27 27 motion Amend Mon 07/08 2:40 PM
Motion to Amend Complaint Related [+] Complaint Filed by Plaintiff Timothy R. Kurtz (Kurtz, John)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Support Memorandum
Thursday, April 25, 2024
26 26 order Pretrial Order Thu 04/25 12:20 PM
Order re Pretrial Proceedings Setting Date for Trial Signed on 4/25/2024. Trial of this matter is set for March 25-28, 2025, at 9:00 a.m., and if necessary, March 31-April 2, 2025, at 9:00 a.m., at the U.S. Bankrup5tcy Court, James A. McClure Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 550 West Fort Street, Boise, Idaho. (mb)
Related: [-]
25 25 court Minute Entry Hearing Held (Other) Thu 04/25 10:20 AM
Hearing Held Appearances: John Kurtz - Counsel for the Plaintiff, Jared Smith - Counsel for the Defendants Report of Proceedings: Telephone Pretrial Conference. The pleadings are not settled. Any and all requests for amendments to the pleadings or to join additional parties in the action shall be filed no later than July 8, 2024. Any and all discovery shall be completed no later than, August 30, 2024. Except for motions in limine, any and all pretrial motions must be filed and a hearing held before the Court no later than November 18, 2024. Pretrial briefs shall be filed no later than March 11, 2025. Trial of this matter is set for March 25-28, 2025, at 9:00 a.m., and if necessary, March 31-April 2, 2025, at 9:00 a.m., at the U.S. Bankrup5tcy Court, James A. McClure Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 550 West Fort Street, Boise, Idaho. A pretrial order shall be forthcoming. The Court schedules a Telephone Status Conference on July 9, 2024, at 10:00 a.m. to address the consent issue for this Court entering final orders and judgments and to determine if a briefing schedule will be necessary. The parties shall call Judge Hillens Conference Call Number: 1-669-254-5252; Meeting ID: 160 5422 0978 Audio File Location: n/a Related [+] (mb)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Timothy R. Kurtz
Friday, February 23, 2024
24 24 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing Fri 02/23 10:24 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing Notice Date 02/23/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
23 23 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing Fri 02/23 10:24 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing Notice Date 02/23/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
22 22 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 02/21 4:36 PM
Amended Notice of Pretrial Conference and Order Related [+]. Pre Trial Conference hearing to be held on 4/25/2024 at 09:30 AM Telephonic Hearing for1 , (krm)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 23-06038 11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property): Complaint by Timothy R. Kurtz against Henry Alec Mclarty, K4 Family Trust, K4 Services LLC. Fee Amount $350 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit # 4 Exhibit # 5 Exhibit # 6 Exhibit # 7 Exhibit # 8 Exhibit # 9 Exhibit # 10 Exhibit # 11 Exhibit # 12 Exhibit # 13 Exhibit # 14 Exhibit # 15 Exhibit # 16 Exhibit # 17 Exhibit # 18 Exhibit # 19 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet) filed by Plaintiff Timothy R. Kurtz
21 21 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 02/21 1:15 PM
Notice of Pretrial Conference and Order Related [+]. Pre Trial Conference hearing to be held on 4/4/2024 at 09:30 AM Telephonic Hearing for1 , (krm)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 23-06038 11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property): Complaint by Timothy R. Kurtz against Henry Alec Mclarty, K4 Family Trust, K4 Services LLC. Fee Amount $350 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit # 4 Exhibit # 5 Exhibit # 6 Exhibit # 7 Exhibit # 8 Exhibit # 9 Exhibit # 10 Exhibit # 11 Exhibit # 12 Exhibit # 13 Exhibit # 14 Exhibit # 15 Exhibit # 16 Exhibit # 17 Exhibit # 18 Exhibit # 19 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet) filed by Plaintiff Timothy R. Kurtz
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
20 20 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 02/20 3:26 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Defendants K4 Family Trust, K4 Services LLC, Henry Alec McLarty (Geile, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
19 19 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 01/26 9:40 AM
Summons Service Executed on Henry Alec Mclarty 1/20/2024 (Kurtz, John)
Related: [-]
18 18 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 01/26 9:39 AM
Summons Service Executed on K4 Services LLC 1/20/2024 (Kurtz, John)
Related: [-]
17 17 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 01/26 9:37 AM
Summons Service Executed on K4 Family Trust 1/20/2024 (Kurtz, John)
Related: [-]
16 16 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 01/26 9:36 AM
Summons Service Executed on Henry Alec McLarty 1/20/2024 (Kurtz, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
15 15 court Summons Issued Mon 01/22 5:34 PM
Summons Issued on Does 1-5 Date Issued 1/22/2024, Answer Due 2/21/2024; K4 Family Trust Date Issued 1/22/2024, Answer Due 2/21/2024; K4 Services LLC Date Issued 1/22/2024, Answer Due 2/21/2024; Henry Alec McLarty Date Issued 1/22/2024, Answer Due 2/21/2024; Henry Alec Mclarty Date Issued 1/22/2024, Answer Due 2/21/2024 (krm)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Summons Mon 01/22 3:14 PM
Summons (Kurtz, John)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 01/22 9:12 AM
Notice of Appearance by Patrick John Geile Filed by Defendants K4 Family Trust, K4 Services LLC, Henry Alec McLarty, Henry Alec Mclarty. (Geile, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 29, 2023
12 12 court Summons Issued Fri 12/29 10:18 AM
Summons Issued on Does 1-5 Date Issued 12/29/2023, Answer Due 1/29/2024; K4 Family Trust Date Issued 12/29/2023, Answer Due 1/29/2024; K4 Services LLC Date Issued 12/29/2023, Answer Due 1/29/2024; Henry Alec McLarty Date Issued 12/29/2023, Answer Due 1/29/2024; Henry Alec Mclarty Date Issued 12/29/2023, Answer Due 1/29/2024 (ef)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Summons Fri 12/29 10:12 AM
Summons (Kurtz, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
10 10 court Summons Issued Wed 12/13 2:49 PM
Summons Issued on Does 1-5 Date Issued 12/13/2023, Answer Due 1/12/2024; K4 Family Trust Date Issued 12/13/2023, Answer Due 1/12/2024; K4 Services LLC Date Issued 12/13/2023, Answer Due 1/12/2024; Henry Alec McLarty Date Issued 12/13/2023, Answer Due 1/12/2024; Henry Alec Mclarty Date Issued 12/13/2023, Answer Due 1/12/2024 (krm)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Summons Wed 12/13 2:41 PM
Summons (Kurtz, John)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Summons Wed 12/13 2:22 PM
Disregard see corrected summons9 :Summons (Kurtz, John) Modified on 12/13/2023 (krm)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Summons Wed 12/13 2:21 PM
Disregard see corrected summons9 :Summons (Kurtz, John) Modified on 12/13/2023 (krm)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Summons Wed 12/13 2:18 PM
Disregard see corrected summons9 :Summons (Kurtz, John) Modified on 12/13/2023 (krm)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Summons Wed 12/13 2:17 PM
Disregard see corrected summons9 :Summons (Kurtz, John) Modified on 12/13/2023 (krm)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Summons Wed 12/13 2:12 PM
Disregard see corrected summons9 :Summons (Kurtz, John) Modified on 12/13/2023 (krm)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Summons Wed 12/13 12:23 PM
Summons (Kurtz, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
2 2 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Mon 12/11 2:49 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 23-06038 NGH] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A8245848. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
utility Corrective Entry Mon 12/11 2:59 PM
Corrective Action: Counsel to please file the Summons so it can be issued. Related [+] Corrective Action due by 12/18/2023. (jm)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Timothy R. Kurtz
Friday, December 08, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 12/08 5:21 PM
Adversary case 23-06038 11 Related [+]: Complaint by Timothy R. Kurtz against Henry Alec McClarty, K4 Family Trust, K4 Services LLC. Fee Amount $350 (Kurtz, John)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 542 turnover of property
Att: 1 Exhibit
Att: 2 Exhibit
Att: 3 Exhibit
Att: 4 Exhibit
Att: 5 Exhibit
Att: 6 Exhibit
Att: 7 Exhibit
Att: 8 Exhibit
Att: 9 Exhibit
Att: 10 Exhibit
Att: 11 Exhibit
Att: 12 Exhibit
Att: 13 Exhibit
Att: 14 Exhibit
Att: 15 Exhibit
Att: 16 Exhibit
Att: 17 Exhibit
Att: 18 Exhibit
Att: 19 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet