Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:19-bk-34574

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:21-ap-03142
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Dec 30, 2021
Terminated:Mar 25, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Thomas Butler
Represented By
Thomas Butler
contact info
Plaintiff
Lynn Tavenner
Represented By
Brittany Jane Nelson
Quinn Emanuel
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Saturday, March 25, 2023
24 24 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Sat 03/25 1:19 PM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 23, 2023
23 23 notice Notice of Dismissal Thu 03/23 4:06 PM
Notice of Dismissal filed by Brittany Jane Nelson of Quinn Emanuel on behalf of Lynn Tavenner. (Nelson, Brittany)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 11, 2022
22 22 answer Answer Wed 05/11 6:08 PM
Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Adversary Complaint; and Demand for Jury Trial Related [+] filed by Bradford F. Englander of Whiteford Taylor & Preston, L.L.P. on behalf of Thomas Butler. (Englander, Bradford)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Lynn Tavenner
Tuesday, May 10, 2022
21 21 order Stipulation and Order Tue 05/10 10:56 AM
Sixth Stipulation and Consent Order Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Related [+] (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-] related document(s)20 Stipulation filed by Thomas Butler
Wednesday, May 04, 2022
20 20 misc Stipulation Wed 05/04 5:57 PM
Stipulation and Consent Order Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint By Thomas Butler and Between Plaintiff filed by Bradford F. Englander of Whiteford Taylor & Preston, L.L.P. on behalf of Thomas Butler. (Englander, Bradford)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 01, 2022
19 19 court BNC certificate of mailing of order Mon 05/02 12:10 AM
BNC certificate of mailing of order Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s)17 Stipulation and Order
Friday, April 29, 2022
18 18 court BNC certificate of mailing of order Sat 04/30 12:14 AM
BNC certificate of mailing of order Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s)16 Stipulation and Order
17 17 order Stipulation and Order Fri 04/29 10:27 AM
Fifth Stipulation and Consent Order Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Related [+] (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-] related document(s)15 Stipulation filed by Thomas Butler
Wednesday, April 27, 2022
16 16 order Stipulation and Order Wed 04/27 9:34 AM
Fourth Stipulation and Consent Order Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Related [+] (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-] related document(s)14 Stipulation filed by Thomas Butler
Tuesday, April 26, 2022
15 15 misc Stipulation Tue 04/26 4:29 PM
Stipulation and CONSENT ORDER REGARDING EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT By Thomas Butler and Between Plaintiff filed by Bradford F. Englander of Whiteford Taylor & Preston, L.L.P. on behalf of Thomas Butler. (Englander, Bradford)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 19, 2022
14 14 misc Stipulation Tue 04/19 9:51 PM
Stipulation and Consent Order By Thomas Butler and Between Plaintiff filed by Bradford F. Englander of Whiteford Taylor & Preston, L.L.P. on behalf of Thomas Butler. (Englander, Bradford)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 15, 2022
13 13 order Stipulation and Order Fri 04/15 8:56 AM
Third Stipulation and Consent Order Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Related [+] (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-] related document(s)12 Stipulation filed by Thomas Butler
Tuesday, April 12, 2022
12 12 misc Stipulation Tue 04/12 2:06 PM
Stipulation (Third Stipulation and Consent Order Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint By Thomas Butler and Between Trustee filed by Bradford F. Englander of Whiteford Taylor & Preston, L.L.P. on behalf of Thomas Butler. (Englander, Bradford)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 01, 2022
11 11 court BNC certificate of mailing of order Sat 04/02 12:11 AM
BNC certificate of mailing of order Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s)10 Stipulation and Order
Wednesday, March 30, 2022
10 10 order Stipulation and Order Wed 03/30 3:04 PM
Second Stipulation and Consent Order Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Related [+] (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Lynn Tavenner,9 Stipulation filed by Thomas Butler
Friday, March 25, 2022
9 9 misc Stipulation Fri 03/25 6:45 PM
Stipulation and Consent Order Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint By Thomas Butler and Between Plaintiff filed by Bradford F. Englander of Whiteford Taylor & Preston, L.L.P. on behalf of Thomas Butler. (Englander, Bradford)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 25, 2022
8 8 misc Stipulation Fri 02/25 9:58 AM
Stipulation Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint By Thomas Butler and Between Plaintiff filed by Bradford F. Englander of Whiteford Taylor & Preston, L.L.P. on behalf of Thomas Butler. (Englander, Bradford)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 27, 2022
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Thu 01/27 4:44 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Brittany Jane Nelson of Quinn Emanuel on behalf of Lynn Tavenner. (Nelson, Brittany)
Related: [-] related document(s)5 Summons and Notice; LeClairRyan PLLC. AP cases ONLY
Thursday, January 06, 2022
6 6 summon CerDocTyp - Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Fri 01/07 12:09 AM
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s) 3 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Wednesday, January 05, 2022
5 5 summon Summons and Notice; LeClairRyan PLLC. AP cases ONLY Wed 01/05 11:48 AM
Summons and notice issued to Thomas Butler Related [+] (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Lynn Tavenner
4 4 court Entered in Error to Wrong Case Number: See entry Wed 01/05 11:44 AM
Entered in Error: See entry Related [+] (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] related document(s) 3 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Tuesday, January 04, 2022
3 3 summon Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Tue 01/04 12:46 PM
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference. Summons Issued to Thomas Butler Answer Due 2/3/2022 Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/2/2022 at 11:30 AM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia, (Bray, Lynessa)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Lynn Tavenner
Thursday, December 30, 2021
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 12/30 8:47 PM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Complaint 21-03142 KRH) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number 34084468, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Thu 12/30 8:29 PM
Adversary case 21-03142 Complaint against Thomas Butler filed by Lynn Tavenner. Nature of Suit: (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:19-bk-34574 (Nelson, Brittany)
Related: [-]