Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:19-bk-34574

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:21-ap-03144
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Dec 30, 2021
Terminated:Mar 25, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Kevin Kenneally
Represented By
Kevin Kenneally
contact info
Plaintiff
Lynn Tavenner
Represented By
Brittany Jane Nelson
Quinn Emanuel
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Saturday, March 25, 2023
23 23 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Sat 03/25 1:25 PM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 23, 2023
22 22 notice Notice of Dismissal Thu 03/23 4:04 PM
Notice of Dismissal filed by Brittany Jane Nelson of Quinn Emanuel on behalf of Lynn Tavenner. (Nelson, Brittany)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 11, 2022
21 21 answer Answer Wed 05/11 6:10 PM
Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Adversary Complaint; and Demand for Jury Trial Related [+] filed by Bradford F. Englander of Whiteford Taylor & Preston, L.L.P. on behalf of Kevin Kenneally. (Englander, Bradford)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Lynn Tavenner
Tuesday, May 10, 2022
20 20 order Stipulation and Order Tue 05/10 11:28 AM
Sixth Stipulation and Consent Order Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Related [+] (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-] related document(s)19 Stipulation filed by Kevin Kenneally
Wednesday, May 04, 2022
19 19 misc Stipulation Wed 05/04 5:58 PM
Stipulation and Consent Order Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint By Kevin Kenneally and Between Plaintiff filed by Bradford F. Englander of Whiteford Taylor & Preston, L.L.P. on behalf of Kevin Kenneally. (Englander, Bradford)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 01, 2022
18 18 court BNC certificate of mailing of order Mon 05/02 12:10 AM
BNC certificate of mailing of order Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s)16 Stipulation and Order
Friday, April 29, 2022
17 17 court BNC certificate of mailing of order Sat 04/30 12:14 AM
BNC certificate of mailing of order Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s)15 Stipulation and Order
16 16 order Stipulation and Order Fri 04/29 10:51 AM
Fifth Stipulation and Consent Order Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Related [+] (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-] related document(s)14 Stipulation filed by Kevin Kenneally
Wednesday, April 27, 2022
15 15 order Stipulation and Order Wed 04/27 9:37 AM
Fourth Stipulation and Consent Order Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Related [+] (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-] related document(s)13 Stipulation filed by Kevin Kenneally
Tuesday, April 26, 2022
14 14 misc Stipulation Tue 04/26 4:30 PM
Stipulation and CONSENT ORDER REGARDING EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT By Kevin Kenneally and Between Plaintiff filed by Bradford F. Englander of Whiteford Taylor & Preston, L.L.P. on behalf of Kevin Kenneally. (Englander, Bradford)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 19, 2022
13 13 misc Stipulation Tue 04/19 9:52 PM
Stipulation and Consent Order By Kevin Kenneally and Between Plaintiff filed by Bradford F. Englander of Whiteford Taylor & Preston, L.L.P. on behalf of Kevin Kenneally. (Englander, Bradford)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 15, 2022
12 12 order Stipulation and Order Fri 04/15 8:54 AM
Third Stipulation and Consent Order Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Related [+] (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-] related document(s)11 Stipulation filed by Kevin Kenneally
Tuesday, April 12, 2022
11 11 misc Stipulation Tue 04/12 2:07 PM
Stipulation (Third Stipulation and Consent Order Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint By Kevin Kenneally and Between Trustee filed by Bradford F. Englander of Whiteford Taylor & Preston, L.L.P. on behalf of Kevin Kenneally. (Englander, Bradford)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 01, 2022
10 10 court BNC certificate of mailing of order Sat 04/02 12:11 AM
BNC certificate of mailing of order Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s)8 Stipulation and Order
9 9 court BNC certificate of mailing of order Sat 04/02 12:11 AM
BNC certificate of mailing of order Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s)7 Stipulation and Order
Wednesday, March 30, 2022
8 8 order Stipulation and Order Wed 03/30 3:12 PM
Second Stipulation and Consent Order Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Related [+] (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Lynn Tavenner,6 Stipulation filed by Kevin Kenneally
7 7 order Stipulation and Order Wed 03/30 3:08 PM
Second Stipulation and Consent Order Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Related [+] (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Lynn Tavenner,6 Stipulation filed by Kevin Kenneally
Friday, March 25, 2022
6 6 misc Stipulation Fri 03/25 6:44 PM
Stipulation and Consent Order Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint By Kevin Kenneally and Between Plaintiff filed by Bradford F. Englander of Whiteford Taylor & Preston, L.L.P. on behalf of Kevin Kenneally. (Englander, Bradford)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 25, 2022
5 5 misc Stipulation Fri 02/25 9:59 AM
Stipulation Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint By Kevin Kenneally and Between Plaintiff filed by Bradford F. Englander of Whiteford Taylor & Preston, L.L.P. on behalf of Kevin Kenneally. (Englander, Bradford)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 27, 2022
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Thu 01/27 4:54 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Brittany Jane Nelson of Quinn Emanuel on behalf of Lynn Tavenner. (Nelson, Brittany)
Related: [-] related document(s)3 Summons and Notice; LeClairRyan PLLC. AP cases ONLY
Wednesday, January 05, 2022
3 3 summon Summons and Notice; LeClairRyan PLLC. AP cases ONLY Wed 01/05 11:50 AM
Summons and notice issued to Kevin Kenneally Related [+] (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Lynn Tavenner
Thursday, December 30, 2021
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 12/30 8:47 PM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Complaint 21-03144 KRH) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number 34084468, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Thu 12/30 8:37 PM
Adversary case 21-03144 Complaint against Kevin Kenneally filed by Lynn Tavenner. Nature of Suit: (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:19-bk-34574 (Nelson, Brittany)
Related: [-]