Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:19-bk-34574

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:21-ap-03146
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Dec 30, 2021
Terminated:Mar 25, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Jeffrey Alitz
Represented By
Jeffrey Alitz
contact info
Plaintiff
Lynn L. Tavenner
Represented By
Brittany Jane Nelson
Quinn Emanuel
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Saturday, March 25, 2023
21 21 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Sat 03/25 1:29 PM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 23, 2023
20 20 notice Notice of Dismissal Thu 03/23 4:01 PM
Notice of Dismissal filed by Brittany Jane Nelson of Quinn Emanuel on behalf of Lynn L. Tavenner. (Nelson, Brittany)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 11, 2022
19 19 answer Answer Wed 05/11 6:12 PM
Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Adversary Complaint; and Demand for Jury Trial Related [+] filed by Bradford F. Englander of Whiteford Taylor & Preston, L.L.P. on behalf of Jeffrey Alitz. (Englander, Bradford)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Lynn L. Tavenner
Tuesday, May 10, 2022
18 18 order Stipulation and Order Tue 05/10 11:31 AM
Sixth Stipulation and Consent Order Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Related [+] (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-] related document(s)17 Stipulation filed by Jeffrey Alitz
Wednesday, May 04, 2022
17 17 misc Stipulation Wed 05/04 5:59 PM
Stipulation and Consent Order Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint By Jeffrey Alitz and Between Plaintiff filed by Bradford F. Englander of Whiteford Taylor & Preston, L.L.P. on behalf of Jeffrey Alitz. (Englander, Bradford)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 01, 2022
16 16 court BNC certificate of mailing of order Mon 05/02 12:10 AM
BNC certificate of mailing of order Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s)14 Stipulation and Order
Friday, April 29, 2022
15 15 court BNC certificate of mailing of order Sat 04/30 12:14 AM
BNC certificate of mailing of order Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s)13 Stipulation and Order
14 14 order Stipulation and Order Fri 04/29 10:48 AM
Fifth Stipulation and Consent Order Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Related [+] (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-] related document(s)12 Stipulation filed by Jeffrey Alitz
Wednesday, April 27, 2022
13 13 order Stipulation and Order Wed 04/27 9:39 AM
Fourth Stipulation and Consent Order Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Related [+] (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-] related document(s)11 Stipulation filed by Jeffrey Alitz
Tuesday, April 26, 2022
12 12 misc Stipulation Tue 04/26 4:30 PM
Stipulation and CONSENT ORDER REGARDING EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT By Jeffrey Alitz and Between Plaintiff filed by Bradford F. Englander of Whiteford Taylor & Preston, L.L.P. on behalf of Jeffrey Alitz. (Englander, Bradford)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 19, 2022
11 11 misc Stipulation Tue 04/19 9:50 PM
Stipulation and Consent Order By Jeffrey Alitz and Between Plaintiff filed by Bradford F. Englander of Whiteford Taylor & Preston, L.L.P. on behalf of Jeffrey Alitz. (Englander, Bradford)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 15, 2022
10 10 order Stipulation and Order Fri 04/15 8:51 AM
Third Stipulation and Consent Order Regarding Extension of time to Respond to Complaint Related [+] (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-] related document(s)9 Stipulation filed by Jeffrey Alitz
Tuesday, April 12, 2022
9 9 misc Stipulation Tue 04/12 2:08 PM
Stipulation (Third Stipulation and Consent Order Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint) By Jeffrey Alitz and Between Trustee filed by Bradford F. Englander of Whiteford Taylor & Preston, L.L.P. on behalf of Jeffrey Alitz. (Englander, Bradford)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 01, 2022
8 8 court BNC certificate of mailing of order Sat 04/02 12:11 AM
BNC certificate of mailing of order Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s)7 Stipulation and Order
Wednesday, March 30, 2022
7 7 order Stipulation and Order Wed 03/30 3:15 PM
Second Stipulation and Consent Order Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Related [+] (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Lynn L. Tavenner,6 Stipulation filed by Jeffrey Alitz
Friday, March 25, 2022
6 6 misc Stipulation Fri 03/25 6:43 PM
Stipulation and Consent Order Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint By Jeffrey Alitz and Between Plaintiff filed by Bradford F. Englander of Whiteford Taylor & Preston, L.L.P. on behalf of Jeffrey Alitz. (Englander, Bradford)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 25, 2022
5 5 misc Stipulation Fri 02/25 9:56 AM
Stipulation Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint By Jeffrey Alitz and Between Plaintiff filed by Bradford F. Englander of Whiteford Taylor & Preston, L.L.P. on behalf of Jeffrey Alitz. (Englander, Bradford)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 27, 2022
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Thu 01/27 4:39 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Brittany Jane Nelson of Quinn Emanuel on behalf of Lynn L. Tavenner. (Nelson, Brittany)
Related: [-] related document(s)3 Summons and Notice; LeClairRyan PLLC. AP cases ONLY
Wednesday, January 05, 2022
3 3 summon Summons and Notice; LeClairRyan PLLC. AP cases ONLY Wed 01/05 11:53 AM
Summons and notice issued to Jeffrey Alitz Related [+] (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Lynn L. Tavenner
Thursday, December 30, 2021
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 12/30 8:47 PM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Complaint 21-03146 KRH) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number 34084468, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Thu 12/30 8:45 PM
Adversary case 21-03146 Complaint against Jeffrey Alitz filed by Lynn L. Tavenner. Nature of Suit: (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:19-bk-34574 (Nelson, Brittany)
Related: [-]