Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:20-bk-50133

Kentucky Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Gregory R Schaaf
Case #: 5:22-ap-05003
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 04, 2022
Terminated:Oct 21, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Cantrell Supply, Inc.
Represented By
Cantrell Supply, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC, solely in its capacity as Plan Administrator of the GenCanna Wind-Down Trust
Represented By
Aaron L. Hammer
Horwood Marcus & Berk Chartered
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Friday, October 21, 2022
court Close Adversary Proceeding Fri 10/21 10:17 AM
Adversary Proceeding 22-5003 Closed. (rah)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 17, 2022
4 4 notice Notice of Dismissal(Adversary) Mon 10/17 12:40 PM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC. (Hammer, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 11, 2022
3 3 court Summons Service Executed Tue 01/11 2:19 PM
Summons Service Executed. (Stricker, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, January 05, 2022
2 2 court Summons Issued (Court Staff only) Wed 01/05 9:56 AM
Summons Issued to Plaintiff for Service. (bjp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 04, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 01/04 4:02 PM
Adversary case 22-05003 Complaint, filed by Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC, solely in its capacity as Plan Administrator of the GenCanna Wind-Down Trust against Cantrell Supply, Inc. Fee Amount 350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer))(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Hammer, Aaron) Modified on 1/5/2022 (bjp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A