Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 6:19-bk-05398

Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Karen S Jennemann
Case #: 6:22-ap-00003
Nature of Suit72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other
11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 10, 2022
Terminated:Jul 07, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Park Square Enterprises, LLC
5200 Vineland Road Suite 200 c/o Vishaal Gupta, Co-CEO
Orlando, FL 32811
Represented By
Park Square Enterprises, LLC
contact info
Defendant
RLI Insurance Company
9025 N. Lindbergh Dr.
Peoria, IL 61615
Represented By
RLI Insurance Company
contact info
Plaintiff
Gene T Chambers
Post Office Box 533987
Orlando, FL 32853
Represented By
Rosemary Hanna Hayes
Hayes Law, Pl
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Friday, July 07, 2023
court Close Adversary Case Fri 07/07 9:29 AM
Adversary Case 6:22-ap-3 Closed. (Ryan S.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 13, 2023
24 24 misc Stipulation (AP) Tue 06/13 6:26 PM
Joint Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice Filed by Carly Marie Newman on behalf of Plaintiff Gene T Chambers. (Newman, Carly)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 04, 2023
court Compromise Cross-Reference Thu 05/04 4:56 PM
Order Granting Motion to Approve Compromise filed in Case No. 6:19-bk-05398-LVV Doc 613 . (Faye)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 07, 2023
court Compromise Cross-Reference Fri 04/07 8:42 AM
Motion to Approve Compromise filed in Case No. 6:19-bk-05398-LVV, Doc. No. 609 . (Ryan S.)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 10, 2023
22 22 order Seal Fri 02/10 7:00 AM
Order Granting Motion To File Paper Under Seal (Unrestricted Viewing Allowed.) Related [+] Service Instructions: Carly Newman is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Adrienne)
Related: [-] 21
misc Electronic Service Text Entry (TEXT ONLY) Fri 02/10 3:58 PM
Service completed via CM/ECF electronic notification. Filed by Carly Marie Newman on behalf of Plaintiff Gene T Chambers Related [+]. (Newman, Carly)
Related: [-] 22
Monday, February 06, 2023
21 21 motion Motion to File Paper under Seal Mon 02/06 7:58 PM
Expedited Motion to File Paper Under Seal within 2 Business Days Per the Arbitration Panel's Directive (Unrestricted Viewing Allowed.) Filed by Carly Marie Newman on behalf of Plaintiff Gene T Chambers. (Newman, Carly)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 13, 2022
20 20 order Reconsideration Tue 12/13 9:38 AM
Order Denying Motion for Reconsideration Related [+]. Service Instructions: Carly Newman is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Jeanne)
Related: [-] 19
misc Electronic Service Text Entry (TEXT ONLY) Tue 12/13 11:34 AM
Service completed via CM/ECF electronic notification. Filed by Carly Marie Newman on behalf of Plaintiff Gene T Chambers Related [+]. (Newman, Carly)
Related: [-] 20
Tuesday, November 22, 2022
19 19 motion Motion for Reconsideration (AP) Tue 11/22 9:59 PM
Motion for Reconsideration of Order Granting Motion to Compel Arbitration Filed by Carly Marie Newman on behalf of Plaintiff Gene T Chambers Related [+]. (Newman, Carly)
Related: [-] 18
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-2019 08 21 Em fr Park Square re Moving Forward in Arbitration
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - 2022 08 17 Em 1 fr AAA w Panel Billing Estimates
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - AAA Rules Excerpt
Wednesday, June 15, 2022
18 18 order Compel Wed 06/15 2:39 PM
Order Granting Motion To Compel Arbitration Related [+]. Service Instructions: John Hutton is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Dianna)
Related: [-] 7
Thursday, June 02, 2022
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 06/02 1:33 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Matthew G Davis on behalf of Defendant RLI Insurance Company. (Davis, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 09, 2022
16 16 court Notice Canceling and/or Rescheduling (AP) Mon 05/09 11:05 AM
Notice Rescheduling Status Conference scheduled 5/10/2022. . Hearing scheduled for 6/27/2022 at 02:00 PM at Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6C, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street. (Aimee)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 11, 2022
15 15 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Mon 04/11 4:50 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Pltf Atty: Rosemary Hayes Def Atty: John Hutton, Michael Murphy, Kevin Hoyos; Matthew Davis: RLI Insurance RULING: Motion by Defendants to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Adversary Proceeding and Memorandum of Law in Support. (Doc #7) - Response by Plaintiff to Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Doc #11) - Defendant's Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Compel (Doc #14) - Under Advisement. A Continued Pretrial Conference is scheduled 5/10/2022 at 11:00am (AOCNFNG) (aj) Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Bill)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 08, 2022
14 14 answer Reply Fri 04/08 3:29 PM
Reply Brief of Defendants Park Square Enterprises, LLC and RLI Insurance Company in Further Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by John B Hutton on behalf of Defendants Park Square Enterprises, LLC, RLI Insurance Company Related [+]. (Hutton, John)
Related: [-] 7
Wednesday, April 06, 2022
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 04/07 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 04/06/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #12 )
Monday, April 04, 2022
12 12 2 pgs order Order Establishing Procedures for Video Hearings and Registration Link to Appear via Zoom Mon 04/04 12:30 PM
Order Establishing Procedures for Video Hearings and Registration Link to Appear via Zoom. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. NG -(ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 11, 2022
11 11 answer Response Fri 03/11 5:13 PM
Response to Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Rosemary Hanna Hayes on behalf of Plaintiff Gene T Chambers Related [+]. (Hayes, Rosemary)
Related: [-] 7
Monday, March 07, 2022
court Mon 03/07 10:47 AM
Preliminary Hearing Scheduled for 04/11/2022 2:00 PM Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6C, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street. Re: Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Adversary Proceeding and Memorandum of Law in Support. Doc7 . Failure to comply with the noticing instructions will result in cancellation of the hearing that addresses this specific matter. Telephonic Appearance Requirement : Effective March 16, 2020, and continuing until further notice, Judges in all Divisions will conduct all preliminary and non-evidentiary hearings by telephone. For Judges Jennemann, Vaughan, Robson, Colton, and Williamson, parties should arrange a telephonic appearance through Court Solutions (www.court-solutions.com). For Judges Delano, Funk, Brown, and McEwen parties should arrange a telephonic appearance through Court Call (866-582-6878). NOTE: All parties should proceed to the website and select 'Sign Up'. For unrepresented parties only, before submitting the completed form, you must select 'I am not an attorney' and 'Certified Indigent'. Once the information is submitted you will receive an email with further instructions. Should the Court decide to hold this hearing by Zoom, the Court will enter a subsequent Order Establishing Procedures for Video Hearing. For hearings held by Zoom, parties should arrange to attend via Zoom only. Parties that wish to listen only, who do not anticipate active participation, or who lack technology to participate by video may participate telephonically only. This entry will serve as the official notification of hearing from the court. Related [+]. (Bill)
Related: [-] 7
Thursday, March 03, 2022
10 10 court Notice Canceling and/or Rescheduling (AP) Thu 03/03 10:57 AM
Notice Rescheduling Status Conference . Hearing scheduled for 4/11/2022 at 02:00 PM at Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6C, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street. (Aimee)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 02, 2022
9 9 misc Certificate of Service (AP) Wed 03/02 7:21 PM
Certificate of Service Re: Order on Defendants Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint in the Adversary Proceeding [ECF No. 8] Filed by John B Hutton on behalf of Plaintiff Gene T Chambers, Defendant Park Square Enterprises, LLC Related [+]. (Hutton, John)
Related: [-] 8
Tuesday, March 01, 2022
8 8 order Extend Time Tue 03/01 1:59 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time e to Respond to Complaint in the Adversary Proceeding Related [+]. Service Instructions: John Hutton is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Rutha)
Related: [-] 6
Friday, February 25, 2022
7 7 motion Motion to Compel Fri 02/25 5:10 PM
Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Adversary Proceeding and Memorandum of Law in Support. Filed by John B Hutton on behalf of Defendants Park Square Enterprises, LLC, RLI Insurance Company. (Hutton, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 11, 2022
6 6 motion Motion to Extend Time (AP) Fri 02/11 5:37 PM
Unopposed Motion to Extend Time Filed by John B Hutton on behalf of Defendants Park Square Enterprises, LLC, RLI Insurance Company. (Hutton, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order
Friday, January 21, 2022
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Notice (AP) Sat 01/22 12:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing Related [+]. Notice Date 01/21/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #4 )
Wednesday, January 19, 2022
4 4 court Notice Of Pretrial / Status Conference Wed 01/19 11:39 AM
Notice of Pretrial/ Status Conference. Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/12/2022 at 10:15 AM at Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6C, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street. (Danielle H.)
Related: [-] 2
Wednesday, January 12, 2022
3 3 misc Summons Service Executed Wed 01/12 2:49 PM
Service Executed on Park Square Enterprises, LLC and RLI Insurance Company of Summons, Complaint, Local Rule 7001-1. Filed by Rosemary Hanna Hayes on behalf of Plaintiff Gene T Chambers Related [+]. (Hayes, Rosemary)
Related: [-] 1
2 2 court ADI - Summons Issued (auto) Wed 01/12 8:59 AM
Summons issued on Park Square Enterprises, LLC, RLI Insurance Company along with Local Rule 7001-1 - Adversary Proceedings - Procedures. Answer Due 02/11/2022. If one or more defendants are the United States or an officer or agency thereof, add an additional five days to the Answer Due date. A Pretrial/Status Conference will be held on , at. A copy of this summons must be included when filing proof of service of this summons. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
assign Assign Judge to Electronically Filed Cases Wed 01/12 8:38 AM
Assignment of the Honorable Lori V. Vaughan, Bankruptcy Judge to this case . (Kathy D.)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 10, 2022
1 1 cmp ADI - Complaint - Original Mon 01/10 2:29 PM
Complaint by Gene T Chambers against Park Square Enterprises, LLC, RLI Insurance Company. Filing Fee Deferred. Nature of Suit: [11 Related [+]],[12],[13],[72 (Injunctive relief - other)],[14]. (Hayes, Rosemary)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 542 turnover of propertycovery of money/property - 547 preferencecovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfercovery of money/property - other
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Original Contract
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - JEL COL and Park Square Transfer Bond