Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:20-bk-50133

Kentucky Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Gregory R Schaaf
Case #: 5:22-ap-05007
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 11, 2022
Terminated:Mar 14, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Hico Farms Inc.
Represented By
Hico Farms Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC, solely in its capacity as Plan Administrator of the GenCanna Wind-Down Trust
Represented By
Aaron L. Hammer
Horwood Marcus & Berk Chartered
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Tuesday, March 14, 2023
court Close Adversary Proceeding Tue 03/14 11:58 AM
Adversary Proceeding 22-5007 Closed. (rah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 23, 2023
12 12 2 pgs order Default Judgment Thu 02/23 3:03 PM
Order GRANTING Motion For Default Judgment Related [+] (bjp)
Related: [-] 7
11 11 audio Audio File Thu 02/23 10:15 AM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 2/23/2023 9:01:32 AM ]. File Size [ 173 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:00:43 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
10 10 court Hearing Held Thu 02/23 9:56 AM
Judge's Minutes of Hearing Held Related [+]. (bjp)
Related: [-] 7 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC
Thursday, January 12, 2023
9 9 order Remanding Thu 01/12 3:57 PM
Order Remanding Order and Striking Hearing Related [+] (bjp)
Related: [-] 6 Order Scheduling Status Conference
8 8 utility Status Report Thu 01/12 11:39 AM
Status Report, filed by Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC. (Hammer, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 11, 2023
7 7 motion Default Judgment Wed 01/11 5:12 PM
Motion for Default Judgment against Hico Farms Inc., filed by Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC. Hearing scheduled for 2/23/2023 at 09:00 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 2nd Floor. (Hammer, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Friday, December 02, 2022
6 6 order Setting Hearing Fri 12/02 9:58 AM
Order Scheduling Status Conference. Status Conference to be held on 1/19/2023 at 09:00 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 2nd Floor. (bjp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 01, 2022
5 5 court Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 09/01 11:05 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default, Hico Farms Inc. (rah)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 26, 2022
4 4 motion Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Fri 08/26 3:23 PM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default (Hammer, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Thursday, January 13, 2022
3 3 court Summons Service Executed Thu 01/13 3:43 PM
Summons Service Executed. (Stricker, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Tuesday, January 11, 2022
2 2 court Summons Issued (Court Staff only) Tue 01/11 3:20 PM
Summons Issued to Plaintiff for Service. (awd)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 01/11 10:34 AM
Adversary case 22-05007 Complaint, filed by Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC, solely in its capacity as Plan Administrator of the GenCanna Wind-Down Trust against Hico Farms Inc. Fee Amount 350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer))(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Hammer, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A