Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:20-bk-50133

Kentucky Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Gregory R Schaaf
Case #: 5:22-ap-05009
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 11, 2022
Terminated:Oct 07, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Austin Tudor
9032 Richmond Road
Paint Lick, KY 40444
Represented By
Austin Tudor
contact info
Plaintiff
Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC, solely in its capacity as Plan Administrator of the GenCanna Wind-Down Trust
Represented By
Aaron L. Hammer
Horwood Marcus & Berk Chartered
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Friday, October 07, 2022
court Close Adversary Proceeding Fri 10/07 11:03 AM
Adversary Proceeding 22-5009 Closed. (rah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 22, 2022
9 9 2 pgs order Default Judgment Thu 09/22 3:52 PM
Order GRANTING Motion For Default Judgment Related [+] (bjp)
Related: [-] 6
8 8 audio Audio File Thu 09/22 10:15 AM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 9/22/2022 9:06:46 AM ]. File Size [ 50 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:00:12 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
7 7 court Hearing Held Thu 09/22 9:46 AM
Judge's Minutes of Hearing Held Related [+]. (bjp)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC
Tuesday, August 23, 2022
6 6 motion Default Judgment Tue 08/23 5:30 PM
Motion for Default Judgment against Austin Tudor, filed by Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC. Hearing scheduled for 9/22/2022 at 09:00 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 2nd Floor. (Hammer, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 SCRA search
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Thursday, August 18, 2022
5 5 court Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 08/18 11:21 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default, Austin Tudor. (rah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 16, 2022
4 4 motion Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 08/16 5:49 PM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default (Hammer, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 SCRA Report
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Thursday, January 13, 2022
3 3 3 pgs court Summons Service Executed Thu 01/13 3:40 PM
Summons Service Executed. (Stricker, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Tuesday, January 11, 2022
2 2 court Summons Issued (Court Staff only) Tue 01/11 3:49 PM
Summons Issued to Plaintiff for Service. (awd)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 01/11 12:35 PM
Adversary case 22-05009 Complaint, filed by Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC, solely in its capacity as Plan Administrator of the GenCanna Wind-Down Trust against Austin Tudor Fee Amount 350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer))(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Hammer, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A