Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 6:19-bk-05398

Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Lori V Vaughan
Case #: 6:22-ap-00005
Nature of Suit72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other
11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 11, 2022
Terminated:Jan 24, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Lennar Homes, LLC
100 North Tampa St Suite 2700
Tampa, FL 33602
Represented By
Lennar Homes, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Gene T Chambers
Post Office Box 533987
Orlando, FL 32853
Represented By
Rosemary Hanna Hayes
Hayes Law, Pl
contact info

GPO Sep 08 2023
Memorandum Opinion on Motions for Summary Judgment (related document(s)28, 29). Service Instructions: Kathleen McLeroy is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Kraft, Jeanne)

Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Friday, January 24, 2025
court Close Adversary Case Fri 01/24 2:57 PM
Adversary Case 6:22-ap-5 Closed. (Aimee)
Related: [-]