New York Southern District Court
Judge:Paul A Engelmayer
Referred: Jennifer E Willis
Case #: 1:22-cv-00321
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jan 12, 2022
Terminated:Feb 14, 2023
Last checked: Monday Jul 11, 2022 4:38 AM EDT
Defendant
City University of New York
Represented By
Jonathan Adam Siegel
Office Of The New York State Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
City of New York
Represented By
John Francis Walpole
Nyc Law Department, Office Of The Corporation Counsel
contact info
Defendant
Thomas P. DiNapoli
Represented By
Jonathan Adam Siegel
Office Of The New York State Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Professional Staff Congress/CUNY
Represented By
Kate Montgomery Swearengen
Cohen, Weiss And Simon LLP
contact info
Hanan B. Kolko
Cohen Weiss And Simon LLP
contact info
Scott A. Kronland
Altshuler Berzon LLP
contact info
Peter Zwiebach
Professional Staff Congress
contact info
Defendant
Rosemary A. Townley
Represented By
Jonathan Adam Siegel
Office Of The New York State Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
John Wirenius
Represented By
Jonathan Adam Siegel
Office Of The New York State Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Anthony Zumbolo
Represented By
Jonathan Adam Siegel
Office Of The New York State Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
Avraham Goldstein
Represented By
William Messenger
National Right To Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc.
contact info
Milton L Chappell
National Right To Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc.
contact info
Nathan J. McGrath
The Fairness Center
contact info
Danielle Susanj
The Fairness Center
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Goldstein
Represented By
William Messenger
National Right To Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc.
contact info
Milton L Chappell
National Right To Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc.
contact info
Nathan J. McGrath
The Fairness Center
contact info
Danielle Susanj
The Fairness Center
contact info
Plaintiff
Frimette Kass-Shraibman
Represented By
William Messenger
National Right To Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc.
contact info
Milton L Chappell
National Right To Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc.
contact info
Nathan J. McGrath
The Fairness Center
contact info
Danielle Susanj
The Fairness Center
contact info
Plaintiff
Mitchell Langbert
Represented By
William Messenger
National Right To Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc.
contact info
Milton L Chappell
National Right To Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc.
contact info
Nathan J. McGrath
The Fairness Center
contact info
Danielle Susanj
The Fairness Center
contact info
Plaintiff
Jeffrey Lax
Represented By
William Messenger
National Right To Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc.
contact info
Milton L Chappell
National Right To Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc.
contact info
Nathan J. McGrath
The Fairness Center
contact info
Danielle Susanj
The Fairness Center
contact info
Plaintiff
Maria Pagano
Represented By
William Messenger
National Right To Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc.
contact info
Milton L Chappell
National Right To Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc.
contact info
Nathan J. McGrath
The Fairness Center
contact info
Danielle Susanj
The Fairness Center
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, April 29, 2024
138 138 appeal USCA Mandate Mon 04/29 4:01 PM
MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to113 Notice of Appeal, filed by Avraham Goldstein, Mitchell Langbert, Frimette Kass-Shraibman, Maria Pagano, Michael Goldstein, Jeffrey Lax USCA Case Number 23-384. for the Southern District of New York was argued on the district court's record and the parties' briefs. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that the judgment of the district court is AFFIRMED. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 4/29/2024..(km)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Supporting document
appeal Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to District Judge Mon 04/29 4:03 PM
Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to the District Judge re:138 USCA Mandate.(km)
Related: [-]