Original Case: 1:22-cv-00321

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cv-00384
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 16, 2023
Terminated:Mar 18, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 20, 2024 4:43 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
Professional Staff Congress/CUNY
Represented By
Scott A. Kronland
Altshuler Berzon LLP
contact info
Peter Zwiebach
Professional Staff Congress
contact info
Hanan B. Kolko
Cohen, Weiss and Simon LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
City University of New York
Represented By
Barbara D. Underwood
New York State Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
John Wirenius, in his official capacity as Chairperson of the New York Public Employee Relations Board
Represented By
Barbara D. Underwood
New York State Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Rosemary A. Townley, in her official capacity as Member of the New York Public Employee Relations Board
Represented By
Barbara D. Underwood
New York State Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Anthony Zumbolo, in his official capacity as Member of the New York Public Employee Relations Board
Represented By
Barbara D. Underwood
New York State Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
City of New York
Represented By
Sylvia Hinds-Radix
New York City Law Department
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Thomas P. DiNapoli, in his official capacity as New York State Comptroller
Represented By
Barbara D. Underwood
New York State Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Avraham Goldstein
Represented By
William Messenger
National Right to Work Legal Defense and Education Foundation, I
contact info
Glenn Matthew Taubman
National Right to Work Legal Defense and Education Foundation, I
contact info
Milton L. Chappell
National Right to Work Legal Defense and Education Foundation, I
contact info
Nathan J. McGrath
The Fairness Center
contact info
Danielle Susanj
The Fairness Center
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Michael Goldstein
Represented By
William Messenger
National Right to Work Legal Defense and Education Foundation, I
contact info
Glenn Matthew Taubman
National Right to Work Legal Defense and Education Foundation, I
contact info
Milton L. Chappell
National Right to Work Legal Defense and Education Foundation, I
contact info
Nathan J. McGrath
The Fairness Center
contact info
Danielle Susanj
The Fairness Center
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Frimette Kass-Shraibman
Represented By
William Messenger
National Right to Work Legal Defense and Education Foundation, I
contact info
Glenn Matthew Taubman
National Right to Work Legal Defense and Education Foundation, I
contact info
Milton L. Chappell
National Right to Work Legal Defense and Education Foundation, I
contact info
Nathan J. McGrath
The Fairness Center
contact info
Danielle Susanj
The Fairness Center
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Mitchell Langbert
Represented By
William Messenger
National Right to Work Legal Defense and Education Foundation, I
contact info
Glenn Matthew Taubman
National Right to Work Legal Defense and Education Foundation, I
contact info
Milton L. Chappell
National Right to Work Legal Defense and Education Foundation, I
contact info
Nathan J. McGrath
The Fairness Center
contact info
Danielle Susanj
The Fairness Center
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Jeffrey Lax
Represented By
William Messenger
National Right to Work Legal Defense and Education Foundation, I
contact info
Glenn Matthew Taubman
National Right to Work Legal Defense and Education Foundation, I
contact info
Milton L. Chappell
National Right to Work Legal Defense and Education Foundation, I
contact info
Nathan J. McGrath
The Fairness Center
contact info
Danielle Susanj
The Fairness Center
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Maria Pagano
Represented By
William Messenger
National Right to Work Legal Defense and Education Foundation, I
contact info
Glenn Matthew Taubman
National Right to Work Legal Defense and Education Foundation, I
contact info
Milton L. Chappell
National Right to Work Legal Defense and Education Foundation, I
contact info
Nathan J. McGrath
The Fairness Center
contact info
Danielle Susanj
The Fairness Center
contact info

GPO Mar 18 2024
OPINION, affirming the judgment of the district court, per curiam (ALK, GC, AJN), FILED.[3615518] [23-384]

Docket last updated: 03/20/2024 4:40 AM EDT
Thursday, March 16, 2023
1 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Avraham Goldstein, Michael Goldstein, Frimette Kass-Shraibman, Mitchell Langbert, Jeffrey Lax and Maria Pagano, FILED. [3486909] [23-384] [Entered: 03/21/2023 12:41 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax
Att: 2 19 pgs Case FILED
2 2 30+ pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 11/30/2022, RECEIVED.[3486913] [23-384] [Entered: 03/21/2023 12:45 PM]
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 03/14/2023, RECEIVED.[3486914] [23-384] [Entered: 03/21/2023 12:46 PM]
Related: [-]
4 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Avraham Goldstein, Michael Goldstein, Frimette Kass-Shraibman, Mitchell Langbert, Jeffrey Lax and Maria Pagano, district court receipt # ANYSDC-27478914, FILED.[3486917] [23-384] [Entered: 03/21/2023 12:47 PM]
Related: [-]
5 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3486920] [23-384] [Entered: 03/21/2023 12:48 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed
Att: 2 18 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED