Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:19-bk-34574

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:22-ap-03005
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Jan 14, 2022
Terminated:Apr 04, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Michael Guinta
Represented By
Michael Guinta
contact info
Plaintiff
Lynn Tavenner
Represented By
Brittany Jane Nelson
Quinn Emanuel
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Monday, April 04, 2022
5 5 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Mon 04/04 4:04 PM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Bray, Lynessa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 24, 2022
4 4 notice Notice of Dismissal Thu 03/24 2:49 PM
Notice of Dismissal filed by Brittany Jane Nelson of Quinn Emanuel on behalf of Lynn Tavenner. (Nelson, Brittany)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 19, 2022
3 3 summon Summons and Notice; LeClairRyan PLLC. AP cases ONLY Wed 01/19 11:53 AM
Summons and notice issued to Michael Guinta Related [+] (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Lynn Tavenner
Friday, January 14, 2022
2 2 crditcrd none Fri 01/14 6:53 PM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Complaint 22-03005 KRH) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number 34113854, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Fri 01/14 6:49 PM
Adversary case 22-03005 Complaint against Michael Guinta filed by Lynn Tavenner. Nature of Suit: (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:19-bk-34574 (Nelson, Brittany)
Related: [-]