Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:21-bk-50018

Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Michael M Parker
Case #: 5:22-ap-05004
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other
11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
Case Filed:Jan 17, 2022
Terminated:May 30, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Terry A Cleveland, Defendant
14426 Brook Hollow Blvd.
San Antonio, TX 78232
Represented By
Terry A Cleveland
contact info
Defendant
James W. Hale, Defendant
229 Fleetwood
San Antonio, TX 78232
Represented By
James W. Hale
contact info
Defendant
Cleveco, Ltd., Defendant
13523 Carlton Oaks
San Antonio, TX 78232
Represented By
Cleveco, Ltd.
contact info
Defendant
Rocking Y, Ltd., Defendant
229 Fleetwood
San Antonio, TX 78232
Represented By
Rocking Y, Ltd.
contact info
Defendant
James W. Hale Profit Sharing Plan, Defendant
229 Fleetwood
San Antonio, TX 78232
Represented By
James W. Hale Profit Sharing Plan
contact info
Defendant
James W. Hale, PC, Defendant
8531 N. New Braunfels Suite 105
San Antonio, TX 78217
Represented By
James W. Hale, PC
contact info
Defendant
TCCPA, LLC, Defendant
8531 N. New Braunfels Suite 105
San Antonio, TX 78217
Represented By
TCCPA, LLC
contact info
Defendant
8531 N. New Braunfels, Ltd., Defendant
8531 N. New Braunfels Suite 105
San Antonio, TX 78217
Represented By
8531 N. New Braunfels, Ltd.
contact info
Plaintiff
J. Patrick Lowe, Plaintiff
Law Office of Pat Lowe 2402 East Main Street
Uvalde, TX 78801
Represented By
Kell C. Mercer
Kell C. Mercer, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/22/2025 1:11 PM CDT
Monday, June 03, 2024
court Hearing Held Mon 06/03 3:28 PM
Hearing Held: Order of Dismissal signed and entered on 5/30/2024 (#83) and Adversary Closed 5/30/2024 . Related [+] (McGee, Maxine)
Related: [-] 1 Original Complaint and Request for Injunctive Relief filed by J. Patrick Lowe (attorney Kell C. Mercer) (on behalf of Trustee) against Terry A Cleveland, James W. Hale, Cleveco, Ltd., Rocking Y, Ltd., James W. Hale Profit Sharing Plan, James W. Hale, PC, TCCPA, LLC, 8531 N. New Braunfels, Ltd. (Filing Fee: $350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)),(72 (Injunctive relief - other)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)))). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of J. Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee # 2 Adversary Coversheet)
Saturday, June 01, 2024
84 84 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 06/01 11:23 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 06/01/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 83 Order of Dismissal with Prejudice (related document(s):82 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Kell C. Mercer for Defendants 8531 N. New Braunfels, Ltd., Cleveco, Ltd., Terry A Cleveland, James W. Hale, James W. Hale Profit Sharing Plan, James W. Hale, PC, Rocking Y, Ltd., TCCPA, LLC, Plaintiff J. Patrick Lowe (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Mercer, Kell) (related document(s):76 Third Amended Complaint and Application for Attachment filed by Kell C. Mercer for Plaintiff J. Patrick Lowe (Mercer, Kell) (related document(s):1 Original Complaint and Request for Injunctive Relief filed by J. Patrick Lowe (attorney Kell C. Mercer) (on behalf of Trustee) against Terry A Cleveland, James W. Hale, Cleveco, Ltd., Rocking Y, Ltd., James W. Hale Profit Sharing Plan, James W. Hale, PC, TCCPA, LLC, 8531 N. New Braunfels, Ltd.),77 Answer to Third Amended Complaint filed by 8531 N. New Braunfels, Ltd., Cleveco, Ltd., Terry A Cleveland, TCCPA, LLC,,78 Answer to Third Amended Complaint filed by James W. Hale, James W. Hale Profit Sharing Plan, James W. Hale, PC, Rocking Y, Ltd.)) (Order entered on 5/30/2024)
Thursday, May 30, 2024
83 83 order AP-Dismiss Case (PDF) Thu 05/30 12:50 PM
Order of Dismissal with Prejudice Related [+] (Order entered on 5/30/2024) (McGee, Maxine)
Related: [-] 82 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Kell C. Mercer for Defendants 8531 N. New Braunfels, Ltd., Cleveco, Ltd., Terry A Cleveland, James W. Hale, James W. Hale Profit Sharing Plan, James W. Hale, PC, Rocking Y, Ltd., TCCPA, LLC, Plaintiff J. Patrick Lowe (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Mercer, Kell) (related document(s):76 Third Amended Complaint and Application for Attachment filed by Kell C. Mercer for Plaintiff J. Patrick Lowe (Mercer, Kell) (related document(s):1 Original Complaint and Request for Injunctive Relief filed by J. Patrick Lowe (attorney Kell C. Mercer) (on behalf of Trustee) against Terry A Cleveland, James W. Hale, Cleveco, Ltd., Rocking Y, Ltd., James W. Hale Profit Sharing Plan, James W. Hale, PC, TCCPA, LLC, 8531 N. New Braunfels, Ltd.),77 Answer to Third Amended Complaint filed by 8531 N. New Braunfels, Ltd., Cleveco, Ltd., Terry A Cleveland, TCCPA, LLC,,78 Answer to Third Amended Complaint filed by James W. Hale, James W. Hale Profit Sharing Plan, James W. Hale, PC, Rocking Y, Ltd.)
court Close Adversary Case Thu 05/30 1:41 PM
Adversary Case Closed for Statistical Purposes Only (McGee, Maxine)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
82 82 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 05/29 5:40 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Kell C. Mercer for Defendants 8531 N. New Braunfels, Ltd., Cleveco, Ltd., Terry A Cleveland, James W. Hale, James W. Hale Profit Sharing Plan, James W. Hale, PC, Rocking Y, Ltd., TCCPA, LLC, Plaintiff J. Patrick Lowe (Mercer, Kell) Related [+]
Related: [-] 76 Third Amended Complaint and Application for Attachment filed by Kell C. Mercer for Plaintiff J. Patrick Lowe (Mercer, Kell) (related document(s):1 Original Complaint and Request for Injunctive Relief filed by J. Patrick Lowe (attorney Kell C. Mercer) (on behalf of Trustee) against Terry A Cleveland, James W. Hale, Cleveco, Ltd., Rocking Y, Ltd., James W. Hale Profit Sharing Plan, James W. Hale, PC, TCCPA, LLC, 8531 N. New Braunfels, Ltd.),77 Answer to Third Amended Complaint filed by 8531 N. New Braunfels, Ltd., Cleveco, Ltd., Terry A Cleveland, TCCPA, LLC,,78 Answer to Third Amended Complaint filed by James W. Hale, James W. Hale Profit Sharing Plan, James W. Hale, PC, Rocking Y, Ltd.
Att: 1 21 pgs Proposed Order
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
court Notice Regarding ZOOM Request (MMP) Tue 05/28 7:50 AM
Judge's Notice, Permitting John Patrick Lowe Appearance at hearing on 06/03/2024, via ZOOM, https://www.zoomgov.com/my/parkercourt1 MEETING ID: 160 5269 3674 . Prior to the Hearing starting ALL PARTIES DIALING INTO ZOOM WILL BE HELD IN THE WAITING ROOM WHERE YOU WILL REMAIN UNTIL YOUR CASE IS CALLED AT WHICH TIME YOU WILL BE MOVED INTO THE LIVE COURT HEARING. Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Original Complaint and Request for Injunctive Relief filed by J. Patrick Lowe (attorney Kell C. Mercer) (on behalf of Trustee) against Terry A Cleveland, James W. Hale, Cleveco, Ltd., Rocking Y, Ltd., James W. Hale Profit Sharing Plan, James W. Hale, PC, TCCPA, LLC, 8531 N. New Braunfels, Ltd. (Castleberry, Deanna
misc Request for Telephonic or Webex Appearance Tue 05/28 5:21 AM
Request for Webex Appearance(Who: The Chapter 7 trustee, the Plaintiff., Reason: To save the time and expense of travel. The Court has aprpoved the settlement of this adversary proceeding., ) (Date and Time of Hearing: June 3, 2024 at 2 Pm) filed by John Patrick Lowe for Plaintiff J. Patrick Lowe (Lowe, John) Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Original Complaint and Request for Injunctive Relief filed by J. Patrick Lowe (attorney Kell C. Mercer) (on behalf of Trustee) against Terry A Cleveland, James W. Hale, Cleveco, Ltd., Rocking Y, Ltd., James W. Hale Profit Sharing Plan, James W. Hale, PC, TCCPA, LLC, 8531 N. New Braunfels, Ltd. (Filing Fee: $350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)),(72 (Injunctive relief - other)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)))). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of J. Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee # 2 Adversary Coversheet)