Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:20-bk-50133

Kentucky Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Gregory R Schaaf
Case #: 5:22-ap-05016
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 17, 2022
Terminated:Feb 09, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Kenneth Anderson
6675 Van Meter Road
Winchester, KY 40391
Represented By
Kenneth Anderson
contact info
Plaintiff
Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC, in its capacity as Plan Administrator of the GenCanna Wind-Down Trust
Represented By
Aaron L. Hammer
Horwood Marcus & Berk Chartered
contact info

GPO Dec 29 2023
Memorandum Opinion (RE: related document(s)15 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC) (awd)

Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Friday, February 09, 2024
court Close Adversary Proceeding Fri 02/09 11:40 AM
Adversary Proceeding 22-5016 Closed. (rah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
30 30 order Generic Tue 01/16 10:05 AM
Order DISMISSING Counts 2 and 3 of the Complaint Related [+] (tb)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC
Friday, December 29, 2023
29 29 1 pgs order Judgment Fri 12/29 10:08 AM
Summary Judgment for Plaintiff on Counts 1, 4 and 5. (awd)
Related: [-]
28 28 8 pgs order Memorandum Opinion Fri 12/29 10:05 AM
Memorandum Opinion Related [+] (awd)
Related: [-] 15 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC
Thursday, December 21, 2023
27 27 audio Audio File Thu 12/21 2:15 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 12/21/2023 9:48:52 AM ]. File Size [ 2092 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:08:43 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
26 26 audio Audio File Thu 12/21 2:15 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 12/21/2023 9:38:33 AM ]. File Size [ 133 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:00:33 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
25 25 order Extend Time Thu 12/21 2:11 PM
Order GRANTING Motion to file Late Response Related [+] (alf)
Related: [-] 19
24 24 court Hearing Held Thu 12/21 1:25 PM
Judge's Minutes of Hearing Held Related [+]. (alf)
Related: [-] 15 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC
23 23 court Hearing Held Thu 12/21 1:22 PM
Judge's Minutes of Hearing Held Related [+]. (alf)
Related: [-] 19 Motion to Extend Time filed by Defendant Kenneth Anderson
Thursday, December 14, 2023
22 22 answer Response/Reply Thu 12/14 10:16 PM
Reply Filed by Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC Related [+]. (Hammer, Aaron)
Related: [-] 15 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
21 21 order Setting or Continuing Hearing Wed 12/13 11:16 AM
Order Setting Hearing Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 12/21/2023 at 09:00 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 2nd Floor. (bjp)
Related: [-] 19 Motion to Extend Time to allow for the late filing of Response to Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Kenneth Anderson
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
20 20 misc Proposed Order Submitted Tue 12/12 1:33 PM
Proposed Order submitted by Brian N. Thomas on behalf of Kenneth Anderson Related [+]. (Thomas, Brian)
Related: [-] 19 Motion to Extend Time filed by Defendant Kenneth Anderson
19 19 motion Extend Time Tue 12/12 1:30 PM
Motion to Extend Time to allow for the late filing of Response to Summary Judgment, filed by Kenneth Anderson Related [+] (Thomas, Brian)
Related: [-] 15 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC
Att: 1 Exhibit Summary Judgment Response
Att: 2 Exhibit Discovery Responses
Att: 3 Exhibit Affidavit of service of discovery
18 18 order Remanding Tue 12/12 7:59 AM
Order Remanding Show Cause Order and Striking Hearing Related [+] (tb)
Related: [-] 14 Order to Show Cause
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
17 17 order Scheduling Summary Judgment Hearing Tue 11/21 1:47 PM
Order Scheduling Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment Related [+]. Summary Judgment hearing scheduled for 12/21/2023 at 09:00 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 2nd Floor. (bjp)
Related: [-] 15 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC
Monday, November 20, 2023
16 16 notice Notice of Hearing Mon 11/20 4:33 PM
Notice of Hearing for December 21, 2023, at 9:00 a.m. Filed by Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC Related [+]. (Hammer, Aaron)
Related: [-] 15 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC
15 15 motion Summary Judgment Mon 11/20 4:28 PM
Motion For Summary Judgment, filed by Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC (Hammer, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
Att: 4 Proposed Order
Monday, November 13, 2023
14 14 order Show Cause Mon 11/13 3:57 PM
Order to Show Cause regarding lack of prosecution. Show Cause hearing to be held on 12/21/2023 at 09:00 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 2nd Floor. (bjp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 18, 2023
13 13 order Remanding Tue 07/18 2:52 PM
Order Remanding Order and Striking Hearing Related [+] (bjp)
Related: [-] 11 Order to Show Cause
Monday, July 17, 2023
12 12 utility Status Report Mon 07/17 4:36 PM
Status Report, filed by Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC. (Hammer, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Saturday, June 10, 2023
11 11 order Show Cause Mon 06/12 5:04 PM
Order to Show Cause regarding Status Report. Show Cause hearing to be held on 7/20/2023 at 09:00 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 2nd Floor. (bjp)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 31, 2023
10 10 utility Status Report Fri 03/31 2:24 PM
Status Report, filed by Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC. (Hammer, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 12, 2023
9 9 order Remanding Thu 01/12 3:15 PM
Order Remanding Order and Striking Hearing and Order to File Status Report Related [+] (bjp)
Related: [-] 5 Order Scheduling Status Conference
8 8 utility Notice of Clerical Correction Thu 01/12 3:11 PM
Notice of Clerical Correction. Copy of Order Remanding Order and Striking Hearing and Order to File Status Report entered in 22-5020 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Curtis [ECF No.7 ] was filed in the the wrong case. Document has been terminated.. (bjp)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Remanding Thu 01/12 1:07 PM
Entered in Error. DISREGARD: Copy of Order Remanding Order and Striking Hearing and Order to File Status Report entered in 22-5020 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Curtis Related [+] (bjp) Modified on 1/12/2023 (bjp)
Related: [-] 5 Order Scheduling Status Conference
Wednesday, January 11, 2023
6 6 utility Status Report Wed 01/11 4:56 PM
Status Report, filed by Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC. (Hammer, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 02, 2022
5 5 order Setting Hearing Fri 12/02 10:08 AM
Order Scheduling Status Conference. Status Conference to be held on 1/19/2023 at 09:00 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 2nd Floor. (bjp)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 21, 2022
utility Jury Demand Mon 03/21 10:32 AM
Jury Demand by Kenneth Anderson. (alf)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 18, 2022
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 03/18 11:03 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Kenneth Anderson Related [+]. (Thomas, Brian)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC
Friday, January 21, 2022
3 3 3 pgs court Summons Service Executed Fri 01/21 1:03 PM
Summons Service Executed. (Stricker, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Tuesday, January 18, 2022
2 2 court Summons Issued (Court Staff only) Tue 01/18 12:49 PM
Summons Issued to Plaintiff for Service. (bjp)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 17, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 01/17 1:14 PM
Adversary case 22-05016 Complaint, filed by Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC against Kenneth Anderson Fee Amount 350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer))(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Hammer, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit