Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:20-bk-50133

Kentucky Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Gregory R Schaaf
Case #: 5:22-ap-05026
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 19, 2022
Terminated:Apr 20, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Polymer Packaging, Inc.
8333 Navarre Road SE
Massillon, OH 44646
Represented By
Polymer Packaging, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC, solely in its capacity as Plan Administrator of the GenCanna Wind-Down Trust
Represented By
Aaron L. Hammer
Horwood Marcus & Berk Chartered
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 20, 2022
court Close Adversary Proceeding Wed 04/20 10:07 AM
Adversary Proceeding 22-5026 Closed. (rah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 14, 2022
4 4 notice Notice of Dismissal(Adversary) Thu 04/14 4:45 PM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC. (Hammer, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 26, 2022
3 3 court Summons Service Executed Wed 01/26 12:07 PM
Summons Service Executed. (Stricker, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, January 20, 2022
2 2 court Summons Issued (Court Staff only) Thu 01/20 11:33 AM
Summons Issued to Plaintiff for Service. (bjp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 19, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 01/19 12:42 PM
Adversary case 22-05026 Complaint, filed by Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC against Polymer Packaging, Inc. Fee Amount 350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer))(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Hammer, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Wed 01/19 5:16 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 22-05026 grs] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number A11001191, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 1