Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:20-bk-50133

Kentucky Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Gregory R Schaaf
Case #: 5:22-ap-05038
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 21, 2022
Terminated:Apr 20, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Donnelley Financial, LLC
35 W Wacker Drive
Chicago, IL 60601
Represented By
Donnelley Financial, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC, solely in its capacity as Plan Administrator of the GenCanna Wind-Down Trust
Represented By
Aaron L. Hammer
Horwood Marcus & Berk Chartered
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 20, 2022
court Close Adversary Proceeding Wed 04/20 10:12 AM
Adversary Proceeding 22-5038 Closed. (rah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 14, 2022
5 5 notice Notice of Dismissal(Adversary) Thu 04/14 4:43 PM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC. (Hammer, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 01, 2022
4 4 court Summons Service Executed Tue 02/01 12:38 PM
Summons Service Executed. (Hammer, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Tuesday, January 25, 2022
3 3 cmp Alias Summons Issued (Court Staff only) Tue 01/25 8:32 AM
Summons Re-Issued to Plaintiff for Service. (tb)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 24, 2022
2 2 court Summons Issued (Court Staff only) Mon 01/24 2:08 PM
Summons Issued to Plaintiff for Service. (tb)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 21, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 01/21 12:49 PM
Adversary case 22-05038 Complaint, filed by Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC against Donnelley Financial, LLC Fee Amount 350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer))(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Hammer, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Fri 01/21 7:09 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 22-05038 grs] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number A11004140, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 1