Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:20-bk-50133

Kentucky Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Gregory R Schaaf
Case #: 5:22-ap-05042
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 21, 2022
Terminated:Jul 05, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
BETTER NUTRITIONALS LLC
17120 S Figueroa St
Gardena,, CA 90248
Represented By
BETTER NUTRITIONALS LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC, solely in its capacity as Plan Administrator of the GenCanna Wind-Down Trust
Represented By
Aaron L. Hammer
Horwood Marcus & Berk Chartered
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Tuesday, July 05, 2022
court Close Adversary Proceeding Tue 07/05 2:45 PM
Adversary Proceeding 22-5042 Closed. (rah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 30, 2022
5 5 3 pgs notice Notice of Dismissal(Adversary) Thu 06/30 12:43 PM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC. (Hammer, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 01, 2022
4 4 3 pgs court Summons Service Executed Tue 02/01 12:44 PM
Summons Service Executed. (Hammer, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Tuesday, January 25, 2022
3 3 3 pgs cmp Alias Summons Issued (Court Staff only) Tue 01/25 8:49 AM
Summons Re-Issued to Plaintiff for Service. (tb)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 24, 2022
2 2 3 pgs court Summons Issued (Court Staff only) Mon 01/24 2:10 PM
Summons Issued to Plaintiff for Service. (tb)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 21, 2022
1 1 12 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 01/21 7:08 PM
Adversary case 22-05042 Complaint, filed by Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC against BETTER NUTRITIONALS LLC Fee Amount 350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer))(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Hammer, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Exhibit A