Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:20-bk-50133

Kentucky Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Gregory R Schaaf
Case #: 5:22-ap-05045
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 25, 2022
Terminated:Oct 07, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Gregory W. Hensley
1746 Pollys Bend Rd
Lancaster, KY 40444
Represented By
Gregory W. Hensley
contact info
Plaintiff
Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC, solely in its capacity as Plan Administrator of the GenCanna Wind-Down Trust
Represented By
Aaron L. Hammer
Horwood Marcus & Berk Chartered
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Friday, October 07, 2022
court Close Adversary Proceeding Fri 10/07 11:16 AM
Adversary Proceeding 22-5045 Closed. (rah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 22, 2022
9 9 2 pgs order Default Judgment Thu 09/22 4:01 PM
Order GRANTING Motion For Default Judgment Related [+] (bjp)
Related: [-] 6
8 8 audio Audio File Thu 09/22 10:15 AM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 9/22/2022 9:07:39 AM ]. File Size [ 46 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:00:11 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
7 7 court Hearing Held Thu 09/22 10:08 AM
Judge's Minutes of Hearing Held Related [+]. (bjp)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC
Thursday, September 08, 2022
6 6 motion Default Judgment Thu 09/08 4:38 PM
Motion for Default Judgment against Gregory W. Hensley, a/k/a Greg Hensley, filed by Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC. Hearing scheduled for 9/22/2022 at 09:00 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 2nd Floor. (Hammer, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 SCRA Report
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Thursday, September 01, 2022
5 5 court Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 09/01 12:11 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default, Gregory Hensley (rah)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 29, 2022
4 4 motion Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Mon 08/29 5:32 PM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default (Hammer, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 SCRA Report
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Tuesday, February 01, 2022
3 3 3 pgs court Summons Service Executed Tue 02/01 12:52 PM
Summons Service Executed. (Hammer, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, January 26, 2022
2 2 court Summons Issued (Court Staff only) Wed 01/26 11:08 AM
Summons Issued to Plaintiff for Service. (bjp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 25, 2022
1 1 12 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 01/25 5:59 PM
Adversary case 22-05045 Complaint, filed by Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC against Gregory W. Hensley Fee Amount 350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer))(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Hammer, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A