Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:20-bk-50133

Kentucky Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Gregory R Schaaf
Case #: 5:22-ap-05050
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 26, 2022
Terminated:May 04, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
ETC DEVELOPMENT, LLC
401 Broadway
Padukah, KY 42001
Represented By
ETC DEVELOPMENT, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC, solely in its capacity as Plan Administrator of the GenCanna Wind-Down Trust
Represented By
Aaron L. Hammer
Horwood Marcus & Berk Chartered
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Wednesday, May 04, 2022
court Close Adversary Proceeding Wed 05/04 9:29 AM
Adversary Proceeding 22-5050 Closed. (rah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 03, 2022
8 8 notice Notice of Dismissal(Adversary) Tue 05/03 2:56 PM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC. (Hammer, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 15, 2022
7 7 order Extend Time Fri 04/15 3:34 PM
Order GRANTING Defendant's Motion to Extend Time to Answer Related [+]. (lmu)
Related: [-] 5
Tuesday, March 29, 2022
6 6 epo Make Application to Practice or Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/29 3:16 PM
Deficiency - Action Required The Court having reviewed the Motion to Extend Time [ECF No. 5 ] filed by Alexander Blackwell on behalf of ETC Development, LLC d/b/a Luxe Properties, and it appearing that Alexander Blackwell is not admitted to practice before this Court, It is ORDERED that, within 14 days from the date of this Order, Alexander Blackwell shall make application to practice in this district or file a motion to appear pro hac vice pursuant to Rules 83.1 and 83.2 of the Joint Local Rules for the United States District Courts for the Eastern and Western Districts of Kentucky. Failure to comply with this Order may result in any related filing by Alexander Blackwell being STRICKEN from the record. /s/ Judge Gregory R. Schaaf. Document due: 4/12/2022. (lmu)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 25, 2022
5 5 motion Extend Time Fri 03/25 6:30 PM
Motion to Extend Time File An Answer to Adversary Complaint, filed by ETC DEVELOPMENT, LLC. Last day to file objections: 4/8/2022. (Blackwell, Alex)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 03/25 6:28 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Alex D Blackwell Filed by on behalf of ETC DEVELOPMENT, LLC. (Blackwell, Alex)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 01, 2022
3 3 court Summons Service Executed Tue 02/01 1:02 PM
Summons Service Executed. (Hammer, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, January 27, 2022
2 2 court Summons Issued (Court Staff only) Thu 01/27 9:41 AM
Summons Issued to Plaintiff for Service. (bjp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 26, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 01/26 5:19 PM
Adversary case 22-05050 Complaint, filed by Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC against ETC DEVELOPMENT, LLC Fee Amount 350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer))(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Hammer, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A