Original Case: 1:19-cv-01277

D.C. Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:22-cvpri-07019
Typecivil private / private
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Case Filed:Feb 17, 2022
Terminated:Jul 30, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 31, 2024 7:29 AM EDT
Amicus Curiae for Appellee
EarthRights International
Represented By
Richard Herz
EarthRights International
contact info
Michelle Chance Harrison
EarthRights International
contact info
Marco Benjamin Simons
EarthRights International
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
Corporacion CIMEX, S.A. (Panama), Panama
Represented By
Nathan Yaffe
Rabinowitz, Boudin, Standard, Krinsky & Lieberman, P.C.
contact info
Lindsey Frank
Rabinowitz, Boudin, Standard, Krinsky & Lieberman, P.C.
contact info
Michael Robert Krinsky
Rabinowitz, Boudin, Standard, Krinsky & Lieberman, P.C.
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
Union Cuba-Petroleo
Represented By
Nathan Yaffe
Rabinowitz, Boudin, Standard, Krinsky & Lieberman, P.C.
contact info
Lindsey Frank
Rabinowitz, Boudin, Standard, Krinsky & Lieberman, P.C.
contact info
Michael Robert Krinsky
Rabinowitz, Boudin, Standard, Krinsky & Lieberman, P.C.
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Corporacion CIMEX, S.A. (Cuba)
Represented By
Michael Robert Krinsky
Rabinowitz, Boudin, Standard, Krinsky & Lieberman, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Exxon Mobil Corporation
Represented By
Steven K. Davidson
Steptoe & Johnson LLP
contact info
Michael Gerard Scavelli
Steptoe LLP
contact info
Michael J. Baratz
Steptoe & Johnson LLP
contact info
Shannen Wayne Coffin
Steptoe & Johnson LLP
contact info

GPO Jul 30 2024
OPINION [2067294] filed (Pages: 36) for the Court by Judge Srinivasan, DISSENTING OPINION (Pages: 10) by Judge Randolph. [21-7127, 22-7019, 22-7020]

Docket last updated: 07/31/2024 7:29 AM EDT
Thursday, February 17, 2022
PRIVATE CIVIL CASE docketed. 22-7019
Related: [-]
28 pgs NOTICE OF APPEAL [1935653] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:19-cv-01277-APM filed by Corporacion CIMEX, S.A. (Panama) and Union Cuba-Petroleo. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 22-7019 22-7019
Related: [-]