Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:20-bk-20086

Wyoming Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Cathleen D Parker
Case #: 2:22-ap-02003
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Feb 23, 2022
Terminated:Oct 24, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Bankruptcy Department 8950 Cypress Waters Blvd
Coppell, TX 75019
Represented By
Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
David L. Miller
117 W. 200 S.
Farmington, UT 84025
Represented By
Brian J. Porter
Mckay Burton & Thurman
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:06 PM MDT
Monday, October 24, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Mon 10/24 7:03 AM
Adversary Case 2:22-ap-2003 Closed . (dcsl)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 30, 2022
17 17 notice Notice of Dismissal Fri 09/30 3:58 PM
Notice of Dismissal. Filed by David L. Miller (Porter, Brian)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 09, 2022
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 09/09 10:21 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 09/09/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Wednesday, September 07, 2022
15 15 order Extend Time Wed 09/07 8:24 AM
Order Granting Fourth Joint Stipulation to Extend Time for Nationstar Mortgage LLC to Answer Complaint Related [+] (dxj)
Related: [-] 14
Thursday, September 01, 2022
14 14 motion Extend Time Thu 09/01 5:41 PM
Joint Motion to Extend Time to File Answer Related [+]. Filed by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (Krabbenhoft, Katelyn)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, July 07, 2022
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 07/07 10:22 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 07/07/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Tuesday, July 05, 2022
12 12 order Extend Time Tue 07/05 3:00 PM
Order Granting Third Joint Stipulation to Extend Time for NationStar Mortgage LLC to Answer to Complaint Related [+] (dxj)
Related: [-] 11
Friday, July 01, 2022
11 11 motion Extend Time Fri 07/01 3:05 PM
Joint Motion to Extend Time to File Answer Related [+]. Filed by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (Krabbenhoft, Katelyn)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, June 09, 2022
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 06/09 10:22 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 06/09/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Tuesday, June 07, 2022
9 9 order Extend Time Tue 06/07 11:16 AM
Order Granting Joint Stipulation to Extend Time for Nationstar Mortgage LLC to Answer to Complaint Related [+] (tsm)
Related: [-] 8
Monday, June 06, 2022
8 8 motion Extend Time Mon 06/06 1:58 PM
Joint Motion to Extend Time to File Answer Related [+]. Filed by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (Krabbenhoft, Katelyn)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, May 12, 2022
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 05/12 10:21 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 05/12/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Tuesday, May 10, 2022
6 6 order Extend Time Tue 05/10 3:58 PM
Order Granting Joint Stipulation to Extend Time for Nationstar Mortgage LLC to Answer Complaint Related [+] (dxj)
Related: [-] 5
Friday, May 06, 2022
5 5 motion Extend Time Fri 05/06 4:45 PM
Joint Motion to Extend Time to File Answer Related [+]. Filed by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (Krabbenhoft, Katelyn)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, February 25, 2022
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 02/25 5:07 PM
Summons Service Executed on Nationstar Mortgage, LLC 2/24/2022. (Porter, Brian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 24, 2022
3 3 court Summons Issued Thu 02/24 7:37 AM
Summons Issued on Nationstar Mortgage, LLC Date Issued 2/24/2022, Answer Due 3/28/2022 . (dxj)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 23, 2022
2 2 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Wed 02/23 5:27 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 22-02003 ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A2418071. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 02/23 5:26 PM
Adversary case 22-02003 ADVERSARY COMPLAINT - Nature of Suit (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) - by Plaintiff(s) David L. Miller against Defendant(s) Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. Fee Amount $350. (Porter, Brian)
Related: [-]