Murray et al v. Willkie Farr & Gallagher et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:19-bk-56885
Lead BK case is: 2:19-bk-56885
Ohio Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | John E Hoffman Jr |
Case #: | 2:22-ap-02007 |
Nature of Suit | 1 null |
Case Filed: | Mar 07, 2022 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Willkie Farr & Gallagher
787 Seventh Avenue
New York, NY 10019 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Brian S. Lennon
Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP 787 Seventh Avenue
New York, NY 10019 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Matthew Feldman
Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP 787 Seventh Avenue
New York, NY 10019 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brenda L. Murray
47626 Meadow View Drive
Saint Clairsville, OH 43950 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael J. Shaheen
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:09 PM EDT |
Friday, January 26, 2024 | ||
102 | 102
misc
Document
Fri 01/26 8:19 AM
Amended Clerk's Certification and Transmittal of Record on Appeal to District Court . (kab) |
|
Thursday, January 25, 2024 | ||
101 | 101
BNC
Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document - BNC
Fri 01/26 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 01/25/2024. (Admin.) |
|
100 | 100
appeal
Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election
Thu 01/25 5:27 PM
Amended Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election to District Court. Fee Amount $298 Filed by Plaintiff Brenda L. Murray . (Ogletree, Benjamin) Modified entry to add "amended" to text to match caption of PDF on 1/26/2024 (kab) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Thu 01/25 5:28 PM
Receipt of Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election([LINK:2:22-ap-02007] ) [appeal,ntcaplel] ( 298.00) Filing Fee. Receipt Number A42607301, amount $ 298.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Tuesday, January 23, 2024 | ||
99 | 99
order
Amended Order
Tue 01/23 1:58 PM
Amended Judgment Entry. (kam) |